Connecticut 2024 2024 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05291 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 05/28/2024

                    O F F I C E O F L E G I S L A T I V E R E S E A R C H 
P U B L I C A C T S U M M A R Y 
 
  	Page 1 
PA 24-120—sHB 5291 
Public Health Committee 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING TH E DEPARTMENT OF PUBL IC HEALTH'S 
RECOMMENDATIONS REGA RDING IMPROVED OPIOI D 
MONITORING 
 
SUMMARY: This act requires hospitals that treat a patient for a nonfatal opioid 
drug overdose to administer a toxicology screening if it is medically appropriate 
and the patient consents to it. The screening must at least test for opiates, opioids, 
benzodiazepines, cannabinoids, methadone, cocaine, gabapentin, xylazine, and 
other substances the Department of Public Health (DPH) commissioner deems 
appropriate. Hospitals must perform the toxicology screenings for a three-and-a-
half-year period, from January 1, 2025, to August 31, 2028, and report the screening 
results to DPH as the commissioner prescribes.  
The act also requires the DPH commissioner, by January 1, 2026, and then 
annually until January 1, 2029, to report to the Public Health Committee on the 
toxicology screening results the department receives. The report must (1) identify 
and analyze any trends, (2) identity any benefits patients experienced due to the 
screening results when seeking emergency department care for an overdose, and 
(3) recommend whether hospitals should continue toxicology screening reporting 
after August 31, 2028.  
Under the act, the toxicology screening results hospitals report to DPH 
generally (1) are confidential and not subject to disclosure, (2) are not admissible 
as evidence in any court or agency proceeding, and (3) must be used solely for 
medical or scientific research or disease control or prevention purposes.   
EFFECTIVE DATE: October 1, 2024 
 
BACKGROUND 
 
Reporting Opioid Drug Overdoses 
 
By law, any hospital or emergency medical services (EMS) personnel that treats 
a patient for an opioid overdose must report the overdose to DPH. The department 
must then give the data to the municipal or district health department with 
jurisdiction over the overdose location, or, if that location is unknown, the location 
in which the hospital or EMS personnel treated the patient, as DPH deems 
necessary to develop preventive initiatives. 
In addition, the law requires hospitals that treat patients for nonfatal opioid drug 
overdoses to administer mental health screenings or patient assessments if it is 
medically appropriate to do so (CGS § 19a-127q).