Connecticut 2024 2024 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05356 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/09/2024

                     
Researcher: MF 	Page 1 	4/9/24 
 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 5356  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING MODIFICATIONS TO THE RENEWABLE 
PORTFOLIO STANDARD.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill expands the type of projects considered Class I renewable 
energy sources to include certain fuel cell, hydropower, and nuclear 
facilities. By reclassifying these facilities as Class I, the bill allows electric 
distribution companies (EDCs, i.e., Eversource and United Illuminating) 
and electric suppliers to use the renewable energy certificates (RECs) 
generated by these technologies to meet their Class I renewable portfolio 
standard (RPS) requirements. It also allows these technologies to (1) 
participate in certain power procurements administered by the 
Department of Energy and Environmental Protection (DEEP); (2) 
qualify for certain property tax exemptions (except for nuclear facilities); 
and (3) when applicable, be exempt from municipal building permit fees 
(see BACKGROUND).  
Existing law requires EDCs, for their standard service procurement, 
and suppliers to obtain at least 5% of their total output from Class III 
sources (e.g., certain combined heat and power systems and waste heat 
recovery systems, see BACKGROUND). Under current law, this 
requirement sunsets on December 31, 2024. The bill removes this sunset 
date, allowing the requirement to continue in perpetuity.  
Lastly, the bill requires the DEEP commissioner to study the state’s 
natural gas capacity and report her findings and recommendations to 
the Energy and Technology Committee by January 1, 2025. The study 
must evaluate the state’s natural gas capacity and examine ways to 
expand it, including any needed regulatory or legislative changes. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: October 1, 2024, except the natural gas study 
requirement takes effect upon passage.  2024HB-05356-R000363-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: MF 	Page 2 	4/9/24 
 
CLASS I EXPANSION 
Fuel Cells 
By law, fuel cells are Class I energy sources. The bill specifies that 
these include a fuel cell power plant that is an integrated system 
comprised of a fuel cell stack assembly, and associated balance of plant 
components that converts fuel into electricity using electrochemical or 
electromechanical means (42 U.S.C. § 48(c)(1)(C)).  
Hydropower Facilities 
Under current law, a hydropower facility is a Class I renewable 
energy source if it is a run-of-the-river hydropower facility that (1) is not 
based on a new dam or a dam that DEEP identifies as a candidate for 
removal and (2) meets applicable state and federal requirements, 
including state dam safety requirements and applicable site-specific 
standards for water quality and fish passage. Under current law, to be a 
Class I energy source, these facilities must also either be a facility that: 
1. began operating after July 1, 2003, and has a generating capacity 
of up to 60 megawatts; or 
2. received a new license after January 1, 2018, under Federal 
Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC) rules. 
The bill instead makes all hydropower facilities Class I renewable 
energy sources.   
(By law, for purposes of RPS compliance, no more than 2.5% of a 
supplier’s or EDC’s output may be generated from a Class I hydropower 
facility that received a new license under FERC rules (CGS § 16-
245a(b)(2)). The bill retains this provision but deletes the category of 
hydropower to which it applies.)  
Nuclear Facilities  
Under current law, nuclear facilities constructed on or after October 
1, 2023, are Class I renewable energy sources. The bill makes all nuclear 
facilities Class I renewable energy sources, regardless of when they were 
constructed. While certain Class I renewable energy sources are eligible  2024HB-05356-R000363-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: MF 	Page 3 	4/9/24 
 
for property tax exemptions, existing law, unchanged by the bill, 
excludes Class I nuclear facilities from this exemption.  
BACKGROUND 
Related Bill 
sSB 385, favorably reported by the Energy and Technology 
Committee, allows the EDCs to request authorization to use energy or 
related products purchased under the zero-carbon procurement 
authorized under PA 17-3, June Special Session, (e.g., nuclear energy 
produced by the Millstone Power Station) to provide standard service. 
DEEP Procurements 
The law requires the DEEP commissioner, under certain conditions, 
to solicit proposals from Class I renewable energy sources built on or 
after January 1, 2013. It also allows her, under certain conditions, to 
solicit proposals from (1) Class I resources built before January 1, 2013, 
or large-scale hydropower and (2) Class I run-of-the-river hydropower. 
It additionally requires her to solicit proposals from operational Class I 
providers if she finds that a material shortage of Class I resources caused 
an EDC or electric supplier to fail to meet its RPS obligations (CGS §§ 
16a-3f, -3g, -3h & -3i). 
By law, if the commissioner finds that any of the above solicited 
proposals meet certain criteria, she may (or, in the case of an RPS-related 
shortage, must) direct the EDCs to enter into agreements with the 
providers to purchase energy, generating capacity, and RECs, subject to 
the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority’s approval.   
Property Tax Exemption 
The law exempts from the property tax any Class I renewable energy 
sources, other than a nuclear power generating facility, installed for 
generation or displacement of energy if it (1) is installed on or after 
January 1, 2014; (2) is for commercial or industrial purposes; and (3) has 
a nameplate capacity that does not exceed its location’s load or, if it is a 
virtual net metering facility, the aggregated load of its beneficial 
accounts (CGS § 12-81(57)).   2024HB-05356-R000363-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: MF 	Page 4 	4/9/24 
 
Municipal Building Permit Fees 
By law, a municipality may, by ordinance adopted by its legislative 
body, exempt Class I renewable energy source projects from paying 
municipally imposed building permit fees (CGS § 29-263).  
Class III Sources 
By law, the following energy sources are Class III sources: 
1. the electricity output from combined heat and power systems 
with an operating efficiency level of at least 50% that are part of 
the customer-side distributed resources developed at commercial 
and industrial facilities in the state on and after January 1, 2006; 
2. a waste heat recovery system installed on or after April 1, 2007, 
that produces electrical or thermal energy by capturing 
preexisting waste heat and pressure from industrial or 
commercial processes; or 
3. electricity savings created in this state from conservation and 
load management programs begun on or after January 1, 2006, 
excluding ratepayer-supported programs, except that a demand-
side management project awarded a contract in a procurement to 
reduce federally mandated congestion charges is eligible for the 
contract’s term (CGS § 16-1(a)(38)).  
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Energy and Technology Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 20 Nay 0 (03/21/2024)