Connecticut 2024 2024 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05363 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/03/2024

                     
Researcher: JC 	Page 1 	4/3/24 
 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 5363  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE PLANNING COMMISSION FOR 
HIGHER EDUCATION.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill makes several changes to the laws governing the Planning 
Commission for Higher Education, which is charged with revising and 
updating the 2015 strategic master plan for higher education in 
Connecticut.  
The bill extends the commission’s reporting deadlines by one year 
and requires all initial commission appointments to be made by June 1, 
2024. If a voting member is not appointed by this date, the bill allows 
the chairperson to designate someone with the required qualification for 
the applicable appointment to serve on the commission. The bill 
requires the chairperson to schedule the commission’s first meeting by 
July 1, 2024.  
Current law requires appointed members to serve three-year terms. 
The bill requires that they continue to serve until their successor is 
appointed. It also specifies that a majority of the membership constitutes 
a quorum for transacting business.  
The bill eliminates requirements that the commission (1) be in the 
Office of Higher Education (OHE), (2) be responsible for implementing 
any policies it develops, and (3) collaborate with the Office of Policy and 
Management in establishing subcommittees and working groups 
needed to supplement its work. It requires the Higher Education and 
Employment Advancement Committee’s administrative staff to serve in 
that capacity for the commission.  
The bill also makes technical and conforming changes.   2024HB-05363-R000236-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JC 	Page 2 	4/3/24 
 
EFFECTIVE DATE:  Upon passage 
REPORTING DEADLINES 
The bill requires the commission to submit its: 
1. preliminary report on the development of the updated strategic 
master plan by September 1, 2025, rather than September 1, 2024, 
and  
2. updated plan by December 1, 2025, rather than December 1, 2024.  
 The bill correspondingly requires the plan to include specific goals 
and benchmarks for 2026 and 2030, rather than 2025 and 2030. 
The bill also delays, from January 1, 2026, to January 1, 2027, the 
deadline for the commission to submit its next annual report to the 
governor and legislature on the plan’s implementation and progress 
towards achieving its specified goals. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 22 Nay 0 (03/14/2024)