Connecticut 2024 2024 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05363 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 05/03/2024

                     
Researcher: JC 	Page 1 	5/3/24 
 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 5363 (as amended by House "A")*  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE PLANNING COMMISSION FOR 
HIGHER EDUCATION.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill makes several changes to the laws governing the Planning 
Commission for Higher Education, which is charged with revising and 
updating the 2015 strategic master plan for higher education in 
Connecticut. Among other things, it extends the commission’s reporting 
deadlines by one year and requires (1) all initial commission 
appointments to be made by June 1, 2024, and (2) the chairpersons to 
jointly schedule the commission’s first meeting by July 1, 2024.  
The bill eliminates requirements that the commission (1) be in the 
Office of Higher Education (OHE), (2) be responsible for implementing 
any policies it develops, and (3) collaborate with the Office of Policy and 
Management in establishing subcommittees and working groups 
needed to supplement its work. It requires the Higher Education and 
Employment Advancement Committee’s administrative staff to serve in 
that capacity for the commission.  
The bill also makes technical and conforming changes.  
*House Amendment “A” (1) makes the Higher Education and 
Employment Advancement Committee’s chairpersons and ranking 
members voting (rather than nonvoting) members of the commission; 
(2) adds two additional chairpersons to the commission appointed by 
the Senate president pro tempore and House speaker, respectively; (3) 
eliminates the requirement that the commission appoint a vice 
chairperson at its first meeting; and (4) removes a provision allowing 
the commission’s chairperson to designate someone with the required 
qualification for an applicable appointment if an appointment is not  2024HB-05363-R010655-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JC 	Page 2 	5/3/24 
 
made by the deadline. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: Upon passage 
COMMISSION MEMBERSHI P 
The bill makes the chairpersons and ranking members of the Higher 
Education and Employment Advancement Committee voting members 
of the commission, rather than ex-officio nonvoting members. In doing 
so, it increases the number of the commission’s voting members from 19 
to 23, and correspondingly decreases the number of nonvoting members 
from 14 to 10.   
Current law requires the Governor to appoint the commission’s 
chairperson from among its voting members. The bill additionally 
requires the Senate president pro tempore and House speaker to each 
appoint a chairperson from these members, which increases the number 
of commission chairpersons from one to three. The bill also eliminates 
the requirement that the commission elect a vice chairperson at its first 
meeting. 
Current law requires appointed members to serve three-year terms. 
The bill requires that they continue to serve until their successor is 
appointed. It also specifies that a majority of the membership constitutes 
a quorum for transacting business.  
REPORTING DEADLINES 
The bill requires the commission to submit its: 
1. preliminary report on the development of the updated strategic 
master plan by September 1, 2025, rather than September 1, 2024, 
and  
2. updated plan by December 1, 2025, rather than December 1, 2024.  
The bill correspondingly requires the plan to include specific goals 
and benchmarks for 2026 and 2030, rather than 2025 and 2030. 
The bill also delays, from January 1, 2026, to January 1, 2027, the 
deadline for the commission to submit its next annual report to the  2024HB-05363-R010655-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JC 	Page 3 	5/3/24 
 
governor and legislature on the plan’s implementation and progress 
towards achieving its specified goals. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 22 Nay 0 (03/14/2024)