Connecticut 2024 2024 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00013 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/17/2024

                     
Researcher: JC 	Page 1 	4/17/24 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sSB 13  
 
AN ACT INCENTIVIZING STUDENT LOAN REPAYMENT 
ASSISTANCE.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill expands the student loan payment tax credit for qualified 
employers that make eligible student loan payments on a qualified 
employee’s behalf (see below). It does so by allowing the employer to 
claim the credit for eligible payments it made to a student loan servicer 
on a qualified employee’s behalf on any student education loan, rather 
than only loans the Connecticut Higher Education Supplemental Loan 
Authority (CHESLA) issued. It also establishes requirements an 
employer must follow when filing for a credit refund or exchange with 
the Department of Revenue Services (DRS). 
The bill also caps the aggregate amount of tax credits the DRS 
commissioner may reserve for this program at $10 million per calendar 
or income year, and the credits must be reserved in the order of 
applications the commissioner receives.  
It also requires CHESLA to (1) establish a High Priority Occupation 
Loan Subsidy Program to subsidize interest rates on loans it issues to 
eligible individuals employed in high priority occupations and (2) 
consult with the Office of Workforce Strategy (OWS) to designate 
occupations as such.  
Lastly, the bill makes technical and conforming changes. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: July 1, 2024, except the tax credit expansion is 
effective January 1, 2025, and applicable to calendar or income years 
commencing on or after that date. 
QUALIFIED EMPLOYER TAX CREDIT OR REFUND 
Existing law allows qualified employers that make payments on  2024SB-00013-R000523-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JC 	Page 2 	4/17/24 
 
qualified employees’ eligible student loans (i.e., CHESLA loans) to claim 
a tax credit or refund equal to 50% of the payments made up to a 
maximum annual credit of $2,625 per employee per calendar or income 
year. By law, “qualified employees” are Connecticut residents who (1) 
earned their first bachelor’s degree within the last five years; (2) are 
employed full time (i.e., at least 35 hours per week) at a qualified 
employer; and (3) are not an owner, member, partner, or family member 
of an otherwise qualified employer.  
The bill expands this tax credit by allowing qualified employers to 
claim it for eligible student loan payments it made on behalf of an 
eligible employee to a student loan servicer (see below) on any student 
education loan, rather than only payments to CHESLA for CHESLA-
issued loans. 
By law, and under the bill, a “student loan servicer” is any person, 
regardless of location, that is responsible for servicing any student 
education loan to any student loan borrower (CGS § 36a-846(12)).  
TAX CREDIT APPLICATION REQUIREMENTS 
To claim the student loan payment tax credit, the bill requires an 
eligible qualified employer to file an application with the DRS 
commissioner in a form and manner he prescribes. The application must 
include the following: 
1. a list of qualified employees on whose behalf the qualified 
employer will be making an eligible student loan payment, 
2. the total amount the qualified employer will pay towards each 
qualified employee’s student education loan in the calendar or 
income year, 
3. the employee’s student loan servicer, and 
4. any other information the commissioner requires.  
The bill requires the DRS commissioner, upon receiving an 
application, to determine and reserve the credit amount the qualified  2024SB-00013-R000523-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JC 	Page 3 	4/17/24 
 
employer will be entitled to claim and to issue a voucher in that amount 
to the employer. The bill prohibits a qualified employer from claiming 
or a qualified small business (i.e., a qualified employer with gross 
receipts of $5 million or less) from exchanging more than the amount in 
the voucher for any calendar or income year.  
HIGH PRIORITY OCCUPA TION LOAN SUBSIDY PROGRAM 
The bill requires CHESLA to establish a High Priority Occupation 
Loan Subsidy Program, subject to available funding. The program must 
subsidize interest rates on loans CHESLA issues to refinance eligible 
loans to individuals employed in high priority occupations who meet 
the eligibility criteria established by the bill.  
High Priority Occupation Designation 
Under the bill, CHESLA must consult with OWS to designate high 
priority occupations under the program that (1) promote state residents’ 
health, welfare, or education; (2) have a high demand for their services, 
as CHESLA and OWS determines; and (3) are experiencing or are 
projected to experience a workforce shortage that may affect the level of 
services provided. 
Eligibility Criteria and Administrative Guidelines 
CHESLA must also consult with OWS to establish program eligibility 
criteria, which under the bill must include the following: 
1. applicant requirements, including employment requirements; 
2. interest rate subsidies and principal limits on authority loans 
subject to the High Priority Occupation Loan Subsidy Program; 
3. the process for verifying applicants’ employment; and 
4. the requirement that an interest rate subsidy through the 
program terminate for a subsidy recipient who no longer meets 
the program’s employment requirements during the loan’s term. 
Account Expenditure Guidelines 
The bill requires CHESLA to establish a separate, non-lapsing  2024SB-00013-R000523-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JC 	Page 4 	4/17/24 
 
account to hold program funds. The account must contain any moneys 
required by law to be deposited in it, including any state appropriation 
or any sale proceeds from bonds issued for that purpose.  
Additionally, CHESLA must use the funds in the program’s account 
to do the following: 
1. subsidize loans under the program,  
2. cover reasonable and necessary expenses for the program’s 
administration, 
3. issue authority loans to refinance one or more eligible loans, and 
4. maintain a reserve to cover any losses from issuing authority 
loans.  
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference - FIN 
Yea 22 Nay 0 (03/14/2024) 
 
Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 44 Nay 7 (04/02/2024)