Researcher: DC Page 1 3/21/24 OLR Bill Analysis SB 135 AN ACT ESTABLISHING A MAXIMUM CHARGE FOR CERTAIN OCCUPATIONAL LICENSES, CERTIFICATIONS, PERMITS AND REGISTRATIONS. SUMMARY This bill caps at $100 various Department of Consumer Protection (DCP) occupational registration, certification, and license fees. In general, the capped fees are annual credentialing fees for individuals, such as contractors in the trades, but do not include guaranty fund contributions or examination fees. In the case of real estate brokers and salespersons (§ 7), telecommunications infrastructure layout technicians (§ 15), and home inspectors (§ 23), who are licensed biennially, the bill correspondingly caps fees at $200. The bill also caps at $100 the fee for the following business organization certificates of registration that are not issued to individuals: mechanical contractor initial or renewal registrations (§§ 12 & 13) and landscape architecture corporation renewal registrations (§ 16). Additionally, it reduces the renewal fee for certain new home construction contractors that are subject to a one-time 18-month renewal (§ 20). The bill requires the DCP commissioner to adopt regulations by July 1, 2025, to ensure that the fee for a license, permit, certification, or registration issued by the department to an individual does not exceed $100 annually (§ 29). However, the bill excludes from this fee cap credentials issued under the Liquor Control Act (i.e., Title 30 of the General Statutes). (Presumably, the $100 cap does not apply to related fees, such as guaranty fund contributions and exam fees.) EFFECTIVE DATE: July 1, 2024, except the provision requiring the commissioner to adopt regulations is effective upon passage, and a 2024SB-00135-R000071-BA.DOCX Researcher: DC Page 2 3/21/24 conforming change is effective July 1, 2025 (§ 26). FEE REDUCTIONS The bill reduces various occupational registration, certification, and license fees. The table below shows each of the fees that the bill reduces to $100 annually or $200 biennially. Under existing law and unchanged by the bill, fees shown in the table cover a one-year period unless otherwise noted. Table: License, Certification, or Registration Fees Reduced to $100 Annually or $200 Biennially Bill Section (CGS Citation) License, Certification, or Registration Fee Under Current Law 1 (20-281c) Public accountant certificate (limited scope of practice) $150 one-time license fee 2 (20-281d) Public accountant (with unlimited scope of practice) $150 initial license fee $565 renewal fee 3 (20-292) Architect $190 license fee, whether initial or renewal 4-6 (20-305, 20- 306 & 20-308) Professional engineer; land surveyor; combined professional engineer and land surveyor $220 initial license fee, or $190 if credentialed in another jurisdiction under comparable laws $285 renewal fee 7 (20-314) Real estate brokers $1,130 biennial initial license fee $750 biennial renewal fee $375 fee for reinstated license, due for each year or fraction thereof since it lapsed 7 (20-314) Real estate salespersons $570 biennial license fee, whether initial or renewal $285 fee for reinstated license, due for each year or fraction thereof since it lapsed 2024SB-00135-R000071-BA.DOCX Researcher: DC Page 3 3/21/24 Bill Section (CGS Citation) License, Certification, or Registration Fee Under Current Law 8 (20-333) Limited or unlimited contractor in the trades* $150 application fee (see also § 9 below for license and renewal fees) 9 (20-335) Tradesperson* license $150 license fee for contractors, whether initial or renewal $120 for other licensees (see also § 8 above) 10 (20-340d) Swimming pool builder $150 initial license fee 11 (20-340f) Residential stair lift technician $150 initial license fee 12 & 13 (20-341u & 20- 341y) Mechanical contractor (i.e., business entity employing plumbing or HVAC tradespeople for larger-scale projects) $110 license fee, whether initial or renewal 14 (20-349) Television and radio service dealer, including combination service dealer and electronics or radio electronics technician $200 license fee, whether initial or renewal 15 (20-357m) Telecommunications infrastructure layout technician $315 biennial license fee, whether initial or renewal 16 (20-369a) Landscape architecture corporation $200 renewal fee 17 (20-374) Landscape architect $280 initial license fee $160 renewal fee 18 & 19 (20-377m & 20- 377s) Interior designer $190 license fee, whether initial or renewal 20 (20-417b) New home construction contractor $120 license fee, whether initial or renewal (see below for additional changes) 2024SB-00135-R000071-BA.DOCX Researcher: DC Page 4 3/21/24 Bill Section (CGS Citation) License, Certification, or Registration Fee Under Current Law 21 (20-421; see also 20-427(f)) Home improvement contractor (HIC) or HIC salesperson $120 license fee, whether initial or renewal 22 (20-457) Community association manager $200 renewal fee 23 (20-492a) Home inspector $250 biennial renewal fee 24 (20-511) Certified appraiser $375 initial license fee $285 renewal fee 25 & 26 (20-601) Pharmacist license or temporary permit to practice pharmacy $200 initial license fee $105 renewal fee (under current law, the renewal fee is $100 until July 1, 2025, when it increases to $105) 27 Fund-raising counsel $120 license fee, whether initial or renewal 28 Paid solicitor $500 license fee, whether initial or renewal *Generally covers fields of elevator installation, repair, and maintenance; fire protection sprinkler systems; flat glass work; gas hearth; heating, piping, and cooling; irrigation; plumbing and piping; residential stair lift; sheet metal; solar; swimming § 20 — NEW HOME CONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS By law, new home construction contractor registrations are valid for one year and expire annually on March 31, except that certain contractors that previously had a two-year registration that expired on September 30, 2023, are subject to a one-time 18-month renewal expiring March 31, 2025. Current law sets a $180 fee for contractors subject to this 18-month renewal. The bill decreases this fee to $150 for contractors whose renewal date is between July 1, 2024, and March 31, 2025. (It is unclear whether any of these contractors have a renewal date in this time period.) COMMITTEE ACTION General Law Committee Joint Favorable 2024SB-00135-R000071-BA.DOCX Researcher: DC Page 5 3/21/24 Yea 22 Nay 0 (03/07/2024)