Connecticut 2024 2024 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00423 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/04/2024

                     
Researcher: HP 	Page 1 	4/4/24 
 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sSB 423  
 
AN ACT IMPROVING HIGHWAY SAFETY BY PROHIBITING 
DRIVING WHILE ABILITY IMPAIRED AND STUDYING METHODS TO 
DETECT CANNABIS -IMPAIRED DRIVING.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill prohibits driving with a blood alcohol content (BAC) of at 
least 0.05% but less than 0.08% (i.e., driving while ability impaired 
(DWAI)). Under the bill, DWAI is a noncriminal offense, subject to fines 
and license suspension penalties. By law, and unchanged by the bill, 
people who drive with a BAC of 0.08% or higher are considered to be 
driving under the influence (DUI) and face criminal penalties and a 
period of license suspension, followed by a period of mandatory 
ignition interlock device use. The bill prohibits reducing a DUI charge 
to the lesser DWAI offense.  
The bill specifies procedures that police officers must follow upon 
issuing a citation for DWAI, which include immediately suspending a 
violator’s driver’s license for 24 hours.  
Under the bill, DWAI is punishable by a 45-day driver’s license 
suspension and a fine of (1) $100 to $200 for a first offense or (2) $300-
$500 for a subsequent offense. Drivers who commit a DWAI violation 
must also complete an intoxicated operator’s retraining program, which 
DMV must establish under the bill. 
The bill also requires the Department of Transportation (DOT) and 
Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection (DESPP) to 
jointly report annually to the Transportation and Public Safety 
committees on drug recognition experts (DREs) and cannabis 
impairment testing. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: October 1, 2024, except the (1) annual report  2024SB-00423-R000267-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: HP 	Page 2 	4/4/24 
 
provision is effective upon passage and (2) retraining program is 
effective July 1, 2024. 
24-HOUR SUSPENSION A ND POLICE PROCEDURES  
After issuing a DWAI citation, the bill requires a police officer, acting 
on the DMV commissioner’s behalf, to immediately take the violator’s 
driver’s license or suspend his or her operating privilege. The police 
officer may have the vehicle the person was driving removed (e.g., 
towed). 
To get his or her license back after the 24-hour suspension, the bill 
requires the violator to go to the police department, state police 
barracks, or another location the police officer selects and sign a written 
acknowledgment that his or her license was returned. It specifies that he 
or she does not have to pay a license restoration fee.  
The bill requires police officers to write a report of the violation and 
the 24-hour suspension action and file or transmit the report to DMV. 
DMV must determine the report’s form, the information it must include, 
and when and how police officers must send it to DMV. After receiving 
a report, DMV must notify the violator that their license will be 
suspended for 45 days and give him or her an opportunity to request a 
hearing.   
RETRAINING PROGRAM 
Under the bill, DMV must require DWAI violators to attend an 
intoxicated operators retraining program that is taught by DMV or a 
DMV-approved organization and covers the content the bill requires 
(see below). The bill sets a fee for the program at up to $85. 
The bill requires DMV to send a written notice informing the violator 
that he or she must complete the program within 60 days after the notice 
date. If the violator does not attend or complete the program within that 
timeframe, the DMV commissioner may suspend the violator’s driver’s 
license until he or she does so. The commissioner must give notice of 
this suspension and offer an opportunity for a hearing, but the hearing 
is limited to claims that it is impossible for the driver to attend the  2024SB-00423-R000267-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: HP 	Page 3 	4/4/24 
 
program or that there was a mistake or misidentification.  
The bill allows DMV to adopt regulations to implement the retraining 
program.  
Program Content and Format 
Under the bill, the retraining program must: 
1. review driving principles and safe driving practices, including 
the biological, medical, and psychological effects of alcohol and 
drugs and their impact on drivers; 
2. emphasize the dangers of driving after drinking alcohol or using 
drugs, including the problems of drug and alcohol abuse;  
3. discuss penalties for alcohol- and drug-related motor vehicle 
violations; and 
4. emphasize the need to practice safe driving.  
The program may be offered in-person in a congregate setting, 
through distance learning, or both. If any portion of the program is 
conducted through distance learning, it must include interactive 
components, such as mandatory interactions, participation, or testing. 
Program Providers 
The bill allows the retraining program to be offered by DMV or by 
any other organization DMV certifies and it requires that DMV 
determine how many providers are necessary to serve the public. The 
bill specifies that state-licensed driving schools may apply to provide 
the program.  
Under the bill, organizations and driving schools seeking 
certification or recertification to offer the program must apply to DMV, 
in the way the commissioner determines, and pay a $350 application fee. 
Applicants must:  
1. be registered to do business in Connecticut and in good standing 
with the secretary of the state;  2024SB-00423-R000267-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: HP 	Page 4 	4/4/24 
 
2. file and maintain a $50,000 surety bond, conditioned on 
compliance with applicable laws and provided as indemnity for 
losses or expenses the state or a person sustains due to the 
provider’s actions or omissions; 
3. have a permanent place of business in Connecticut where its 
program records will be stored and accessible to DMV during 
normal business hours; 
4. submit a detailed program curriculum and lesson plans to DMV 
for approval, as well as any changes to them; and 
5. electronically send information to DMV on enrollment and class 
completion, in the way the commissioner determines.  
Before certifying an applicant, DMV must investigate the applicant’s 
character, driving history, and criminal history (or the applicant’s 
principals and officers, if the applicant is a business entity). The 
applicant must submit any information on past criminal or civil actions.  
Under the bill, a provider’s certification is not transferable and is 
valid for two years. The commissioner has discretion to recertify a 
provider.  
ANNUAL REPORT 
Under the bill, DOT and DESPP must annually submit a report, 
starting by January 1, 2025, to the Public Safety and Security and 
Transportation committees. At a minimum, the report must include the 
following information:  
1. the current number of police officers accredited as drug 
recognition experts in the state;  
2. improvements or technological advancements related to 
roadside screening for detecting cannabis impaired drivers, 
including oral fluid testing; and 
3. recommendations to (a) increase police officers’ access to drug 
recognition expert training and (b) implement any tests,  2024SB-00423-R000267-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: HP 	Page 5 	4/4/24 
 
strategies, or procedures to reliably and validly identify instances 
of impaired driving from cannabis use.  
BACKGROUND 
Related Bill 
sSB 424, favorably reported by the Transportation Committee, (1) 
lowers the general BAC per se limit for criminal DUI from 0.08% to 
0.05% and (2) establishes an identical reporting requirement for DOT 
and DESPP. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Transportation Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 24 Nay 12 (03/18/2024)