Connecticut 2024 2024 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00432 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/10/2024

                     
Researcher: LRH 	Page 1 	4/10/24 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sSB 432  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING STATE CONTRACTS WITH NONPROFIT 
HUMAN SERVICES PROVIDERS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill generally requires the Office of Policy and Management 
(OPM) secretary to review and report on certain issues that affect 
nonprofit human services providers that contract with state agencies. 
More specifically, it requires him to report on (1) whether the contracts 
adequately compensate the providers for the level of service expected 
by their contracting state agency and (2) any burdensome or duplicative 
reporting requirements the providers must meet for the state. 
The bill also requires the secretary to (1) require that state agencies 
pay the providers within 30 days after they deliver their contracted 
services and (2) review and update the state’s integrated human 
resources, payroll, and financial system (CORE-CT), in consultation 
with the state comptroller, for inefficiency issues that affect the 
providers’ accessibility or financial reporting. 
Under the bill, a “nonprofit human services provider” is a nonprofit 
entity that contracts with the state to provide health and human services 
such as (1) services for people with a physical disability; (2) services for 
people with intellectual or developmental disabilities, including autism 
spectrum disorder; and (3) behavioral health services. A “state agency” 
is any department, board, council, commission, institution, or other 
executive branch agency. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: Upon passage, except that the provision that 
requires the providers to be paid within 30 days is effective July 1, 2024. 
ADEQUATE COMPENSATIO N FOR PROVIDERS 
The bill requires the OPM secretary to annually review the state’s 
purchase of service contracts with nonprofit human services providers  2024SB-00432-R000397-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: LRH 	Page 2 	4/10/24 
 
to determine whether their pay rates adequately compensate the 
providers for the level of service expected by their contracting state 
agency. The annual review must be done in consultation with 
representatives of these providers, with the first review completed by 
January 1, 2025. 
Then, starting by February 1, 2025, the secretary must annually 
submit a report to the Human Services, Government Administration 
and Elections (GAE), and Appropriations committees. The report must 
include (1) a summary of the review, (2) any applicable 
recommendations on requiring contracting state agencies to reduce 
their contractual expectations if they are not adequately funded by the 
contract, and (3) any recommended legislation needed to implement the 
recommendations. 
Under the bill a “purchase of service contract” is a contract between 
a state agency and a private provider organization or municipality (but 
not an individual) to obtain direct health and human services for agency 
clients, but generally not for material goods, or administrative, clerical, 
training, or consulting services.  
BURDENSOME AND DUPLI CATIVE REPORTING REQ UIREMENTS 
The bill requires the OPM secretary, starting by January 1, 2025, to 
triennially review any reports that nonprofit human services providers 
must file with state agencies. The review must at least look at (1) how 
many reports must be filed, (2) the amount of overlapping information 
in them, (3) the time and resources needed to prepare and file them, (4) 
why the reports are required, and (5) how state agencies use them. State 
agencies and the providers must give the secretary any information he 
requests for the review. 
The bill requires the secretary to eliminate or consolidate any 
reporting requirement that he identifies in the review as unduly 
burdensome or duplicative, unless it is (1) needed to prevent fraud or 
misuse of funds, (2) required by federal law or regulations to use federal 
funds, or (3) required by state law (it is unclear whether the secretary 
has the authority to eliminate or consolidate a different agency’s  2024SB-00432-R000397-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: LRH 	Page 3 	4/10/24 
 
reporting requirements). 
Starting by February 1, 2025, the secretary must triennially submit a 
report to the Human Services, GAE, and Appropriations committees. 
The report must include a summary of the results of the review, any 
reporting eliminated or consolidated as required by the bill (it appears 
the bill has an incorrect internal reference), and any recommendations 
for legislation needed to eliminate burdensome or duplicative reporting 
requirements under state law. 
PAYMENTS TO PROVIDER S 
By law, the OPM secretary must set uniform policies and procedures 
for obtaining, managing, and evaluating the quality and cost 
effectiveness of direct health and human services purchased from 
private provider organizations or municipalities. Under the bill, these 
policies and procedures must include a requirement that each private 
provider organization be paid within 30 days for services it delivers 
under a purchase of service contract. As under existing law, the 
secretary must require all state agencies that purchase direct health and 
human services to comply with these policies and procedures. 
CORE-CT 
The bill requires the OPM secretary, in consultation with the 
comptroller, to review CORE-CT to detect inefficiencies, particularly 
those that affect accessibility or financial reporting for nonprofit private 
provider organizations that provide health and human services to state 
residents under contracts with state agencies. It requires the secretary 
and comptroller to update any CORE-CT features that the review 
identifies as outdated (the bill does not specify a frequency or deadline 
for the review and update to occur). 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Government Administration and Elections Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 19 Nay 0 (03/22/2024)