Connecticut 2024 2024 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00432 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 05/05/2024

                     
Researcher: LRH 	Page 1 	5/5/24 
 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sSB 432 (File 397, as amended by Senate "A")*  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING STATE CONTRACTS WITH NONPROFIT 
HUMAN SERVICES PROVIDERS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill generally requires the Office of Policy and Management 
(OPM) secretary to review and report on certain issues that affect 
nonprofit human services providers that contract with state agencies. 
More specifically, it requires him to report (1) every five years on 
whether the contracts adequately compensate the providers for the level 
of service expected by their contracting state agency and (2) every three 
years on any burdensome or duplicative reporting requirements the 
providers must meet for the state. 
The bill also generally requires the secretary, to the extent allowed 
under federal law, to require that state agencies pay the providers 
within 45 days after they deliver their contracted services or submit a 
properly completed claim, and subjects them to a law requiring interest 
on late payments. 
Under the bill, a “nonprofit human services provider” is a nonprofit 
entity that contracts with the state to provide health and human services 
such as (1) services for people with a physical disability; (2) services for 
people with intellectual or developmental disabilities, including autism 
spectrum disorder; and (3) behavioral health services. A “state agency” 
is any department, board, council, commission, institution, or other 
executive branch agency. 
*Senate Amendment “A” among other things (1) requires the review 
and report on provider compensation to occur every five years, instead 
of annually, and to cover a portion of the contracts and agencies; (2) 
delays the start of these review and reporting requirements from 2025  2024SB-00432-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: LRH 	Page 2 	5/5/24 
 
to 2026; (3) requires agency payments to providers within 45 days, 
rather than 30, and subjects them to a law requiring interest on late 
payments; and (4) removes a provision that would have required OPM 
to review and update the state’s CORE-CT system. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: Upon passage, except that the provision that 
requires the providers to be paid within 45 days is effective July 1, 2024. 
ADEQUATE COMPENSATIO N FOR PROVIDERS 
The bill requires the OPM secretary, every five years, to annually 
review a portion of the state’s purchase of service contracts and personal 
service agreements with nonprofit human services providers to 
determine whether their pay rates adequately compensate the providers 
for the level of service expected by their contracting state agency. The 
review must be done in consultation with representatives of these 
providers and examine the contracts and agreements of at least two state 
agencies each year. The first review must be completed by January 1, 
2026. 
Then, starting by February 1, 2026, the secretary must submit a report 
to the Human Services, Government Administration and Elections 
(GAE), and Appropriations committees every five years. The report 
must include (1) a summary of the review, (2) any applicable 
recommendations on requiring contracting state agencies to reduce 
their contractual expectations if they are not adequately funded by the 
contract or agreement, and (3) any recommended legislation needed to 
implement the recommendations. 
Under the bill, a “purchase of service contract” is a contract between 
a state agency and a private provider organization or municipality (but 
not an individual) to obtain direct health and human services for agency 
clients, but generally not for material goods or administrative, clerical, 
training, or consulting services.  
BURDENSOME AND DUPLI CATIVE REPORTING REQ UIREMENTS 
The bill requires the OPM secretary, starting by January 1, 2025, to 
triennially review any reports that nonprofit human services providers  2024SB-00432-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: LRH 	Page 3 	5/5/24 
 
must file with state agencies. The review must at least look at (1) how 
many reports must be filed, (2) the amount of overlapping information 
in them, (3) the time and resources needed to prepare and file them, (4) 
why the reports are required, and (5) how state agencies use them. State 
agencies and the providers must give the secretary any information he 
requests for the review. 
The bill requires the secretary to eliminate or consolidate any 
reporting requirement that he identifies in the review as unduly 
burdensome or duplicative, unless it is (1) needed to prevent fraud or 
misuse of funds, (2) required by federal law or regulations to use federal 
funds, or (3) required by state law (it is unclear whether the secretary 
has the authority to eliminate or consolidate a different agency’s 
reporting requirements). 
Starting by February 1, 2025, the secretary must triennially submit a 
report to the Human Services, GAE, and Appropriations committees. 
The report must include a summary of the results of the review, any 
reporting eliminated or consolidated as required by the bill (it appears 
the bill has an incorrect internal reference), and any recommendations 
for legislation needed to eliminate burdensome or duplicative reporting 
requirements under state law. 
PAYMENTS TO PROVIDER S 
By law, the OPM secretary must set uniform policies and procedures 
for obtaining, managing, and evaluating the quality and cost 
effectiveness of direct health and human services purchased from 
private provider organizations or municipalities. Under the bill, these 
policies and procedures must include, to the extent allowed under 
federal law, a requirement that a private provider organization be paid 
for services it delivers under a purchase of service contract within 45 
days after receipt of the services or a properly completed claim, 
whichever is later. In addition, the payments must be made under the 
law on prompt payment by state departments and agencies, which 
generally requires state agencies to pay interest on amounts due when 
they fail to make timely payments.   2024SB-00432-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: LRH 	Page 4 	5/5/24 
 
As under existing law, the secretary must require all state agencies 
that purchase direct health and human services to comply with these 
policies and procedures. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Government Administration and Elections Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 19 Nay 0 (03/22/2024)