Connecticut 2024 2024 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00443 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/22/2024

                     
 
LCO   	1 of 4 
  
General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 443  
February Session, 2024 
 
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE ACCRUAL OF INTEREST ON CERTAIN 
TAX UNDERPAYMENTS AND THE BUSINESS OPERATING LOSS 
CARRY-OVER PERIOD.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
 Section 1. (Effective July 1, 2025) Sections 12-204c, 12-242d, 12-699a 1 
and 12-722 of the general statutes shall not apply with respect to the 2 
accrual of any interest, in the case of any underpayment of tax by a 3 
taxpayer under chapter 208, 228z or 229 of the general statutes, to the 4 
extent such underpayment was due to the filing of an amended return 5 
necessitated by the guidance in Notice 2021-20, issued by the Internal 6 
Revenue Service, concerning the federal employee retention credit 7 
program. If such interest has already been paid to the Department of 8 
Revenue Services, the Commissioner of Revenue Services shall treat 9 
such payment as an overpayment and shall refund the amount of such 10 
payment, without interest, to the taxpayer. 11 
Sec. 2. Subdivision (4) of subsection (a) of section 12-217 of the 2024 12 
supplement to the general statutes is repealed and the following is 13 
substituted in lieu thereof (Effective from passage): 14 
(4) Notwithstanding any provision of this section: 15 
(A) Any excess of the deductions provided in this section for any 16  Substitute Bill No. 443 
 
 
LCO    	2 of 4 
 
income year commencing on or after January 1, 1973, over the gross 17 
income for such year or the amount of such excess apportioned to this 18 
state under the provisions of this chapter, shall be an operating loss of 19 
such income year and shall be deductible as an operating loss carry-over 20 
for operating losses incurred prior to income years commencing January 21 
1, 2000, in each of the five income years following such loss year; [, and] 22 
for operating losses incurred in income years commencing on or after 23 
January 1, 2000, and prior to January 1, 2025, in each of the twenty 24 
income years following such loss year; [,] and for operating losses 25 
incurred in income years commencing on or after January 1, 2025, in 26 
each of the thirty income years following such loss; except that: 27 
(i) For income years commencing prior to January 1, 2015, the portion 28 
of such operating loss that may be deducted as an operating loss carry-29 
over in any income year following such loss year shall be limited to the 30 
lesser of (I) any net income greater than zero of such income year 31 
following such loss year, or in the case of a company entitled to 32 
apportion its net income under the provisions of this chapter, the 33 
amount of such net income that is apportioned to this state pursuant 34 
thereto, or (II) the excess, if any, of such operating loss over the total of 35 
such net income for each of any prior income years following such loss 36 
year, such net income of each of such prior income years following such 37 
loss year for such purposes being computed without regard to any 38 
operating loss carry-over from such loss year allowed under this 39 
subparagraph and being regarded as not less than zero, and provided 40 
further the operating loss of any income year shall be deducted in any 41 
subsequent year, to the extent available for such deduction, before the 42 
operating loss of any subsequent income year is deducted; 43 
(ii) For income years commencing on or after January 1, 2015, the 44 
portion of such operating loss that may be deducted as an operating loss 45 
carry-over in any income year following such loss year shall be limited 46 
to the lesser of (I) fifty per cent of net income of such income year 47 
following such loss year, or in the case of a company entitled to 48 
apportion its net income under the provisions of this chapter, fifty per 49 
cent of such net income that is apportioned to this state pursuant 50  Substitute Bill No. 443 
 
 
LCO    	3 of 4 
 
thereto, or (II) the excess, if any, of such operating loss over the 51 
operating loss deductions allowable with respect to such operating loss 52 
under this subparagraph for each of any prior income years following 53 
such loss year, such net income of each of such prior income years 54 
following such loss year for such purposes being computed without 55 
regard to any operating loss carry-over from such loss year allowed 56 
under this subparagraph and being regarded as not less than zero, and 57 
provided further the operating loss of any income year shall be 58 
deducted in any subsequent year, to the extent available for such 59 
deduction, before the operating loss of any subsequent income year is 60 
deducted; and 61 
(iii) If a combined group so elects, the combined group shall 62 
relinquish fifty per cent of its unused operating losses incurred prior to 63 
the income year commencing on or after January 1, 2015, and before 64 
January 1, 2016, and may utilize the remaining operating loss carry-over 65 
without regard to the limitations prescribed in subparagraph (A)(ii) of 66 
this subdivision. The portion of such operating loss carry-over that may 67 
be deducted shall be limited to the amount required to reduce a 68 
combined group's tax under this chapter, prior to surtax and prior to the 69 
application of credits, to two million five hundred thousand dollars in 70 
any income year commencing on or after January 1, 2015. Only after the 71 
combined group's remaining operating loss carry-over for operating 72 
losses incurred prior to income years commencing January 1, 2015, has 73 
been fully utilized, will the limitations prescribed in subparagraph 74 
(A)(ii) of this subdivision apply. The combined group, or any member 75 
thereof, shall make such election on its return for the income year 76 
beginning on or after January 1, 2015, and before January 1, 2016, by the 77 
due date for such return, including any extensions. Only combined 78 
groups with unused operating losses in excess of six billion dollars from 79 
income years beginning prior to January 1, 2013, may make the election 80 
prescribed in this clause; and 81 
(B) Any net capital loss, as defined in the Internal Revenue Code 82 
effective and in force on the last day of the income year, for any income 83 
year commencing on or after January 1, 1973, shall be allowed as a 84  Substitute Bill No. 443 
 
 
LCO    	4 of 4 
 
capital loss carry-over to reduce, but not below zero, any net capital 85 
gain, as so defined, in each of the five following income years, in order 86 
of sequence, to the extent not exhausted by the net capital gain of any of 87 
the preceding of such five following income years; and 88 
(C) Any net capital losses allowed and carried forward from prior 89 
years to income years beginning on or after January 1, 1973, for federal 90 
income tax purposes by companies entitled to a deduction for dividends 91 
paid under the Internal Revenue Code other than companies subject to 92 
the gross earnings taxes imposed under chapters 211 and 212, shall be 93 
allowed as a capital loss carry-over. 94 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
 Section July 1, 2025 New section 
Sec. 2 from passage 12-217(a)(4) 
 
FIN Joint Favorable Subst.