Connecticut 2024 2024 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00443 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/22/2024

                     
Researcher: RP 	Page 1 	4/22/24 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sSB 443  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE ACCRUAL OF INTEREST ON CERTAIN 
TAX UNDERPAYMENTS AND THE BUSINESS OPERATING LOSS 
CARRY-OVER PERIOD.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill exempts taxpayers from paying interest on underpayments 
of corporation business, pass-through entity, and personal income taxes 
if the underpayment was due to an amended return filing necessitated 
by Internal Revenue Service (IRS) guidance on the federal employee 
retention credit (IRS Notice 2021-20). It requires the Department of 
Revenue Services to treat any interest already paid on these 
underpayments as an overpayment and refund it to taxpayers without 
interest. 
The bill also extends, from 20 to 30 income years, the period when 
corporations may carry forward a net operating loss (NOL) deduction 
for corporation business tax purposes. (NOL is the amount by which a 
corporation’s total allowable deductions exceed its gross income.) The 
bill’s extended carry forward period applies to NOLs incurred in 
income years starting on or after January 1, 2025. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: Upon passage for the NOL provision and July 1, 
2025, for the underpayments provision. 
BACKGROUND 
Federal Employee Retention Credit 
The federal employee retention credit is a refundable credit against 
employment taxes designed for eligible businesses that continued 
paying employees during the COVID-19 pandemic. Eligible employers 
were allowed to claim the credit on an original or amended employment 
tax return for qualified wages paid between March 13, 2020, and 
December 31, 2021. In September 2023, the IRS ordered a moratorium  2024SB-00443-R000576-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: RP 	Page 2 	4/22/24 
 
on processing new credit claims due to its concerns that a substantial 
share of new claims were fraudulent. It subsequently implemented 
stricter compliance reviews, a voluntary disclosure program that allows 
taxpayers to pay back a credit they received but were not entitled to, 
and a special withdrawal program for taxpayers with pending claims 
who realize they may have filed an inaccurate tax return. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 51 Nay 0 (04/03/2024)