Connecticut 2025 2025 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06040 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/07/2025

                     
Researcher: MHF 	Page 1 	4/7/25 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 6040  
 
AN ACT REQUIRING THE STATE COMMISSION ON CAPITOL 
PRESERVATION AND RESTORATION TO DEVELOP A PROCESS 
FOR ADDING STATUES TO THE STATE CAPITOL AND 
ESTABLISHING THE STATE HISTORICAL COMMISSION.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill expands the State Capitol Preservation and Restoration 
Commission’s duties by requiring it to develop a process for identifying 
and commissioning additional statues for the State Capitol building 
exterior to reflect the state’s diversity, character, and accomplishments. 
It allows the Legislative Management Committee to use capital funds to 
implement this process. 
The bill also requires the commission, by February 1, 2026, to (1) 
develop a plan for installing placards or other signs around the State 
Capitol Building’s exterior to give the public a written historical 
explanation of the various statues and other markers on the building 
exterior and (2) submit the plan to the Legislative Management 
Committee. 
Additionally, the bill creates a 14-member State Historical 
Commission to examine and make recommendations to the legislative, 
executive, and judicial branches on questions of memorialization and 
commemoration related to Connecticut and U.S. history. The 
commission’s members are (1) certain public officers or (2) scholars in 
certain fields affiliated with an in-state higher education institution. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: July 1, 2025, except that the provision requiring a 
plan for exterior signage takes effect upon passage. 
IDENTIFYING AND COMM ISSIONING ADDITIONAL STATUES 
Existing law requires the State Capitol Preservation and Restoration 
Commission to continually review and study the State Capitol building  2025HB-06040-R000550-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: MHF 	Page 2 	4/7/25 
 
and grounds with a view to developing a master plan for preserving 
and restoring it consistent with the building’s original historical 
character. 
The bill requires the commission to develop a process for identifying 
and commissioning additional statues to for the State Capitol building 
exterior to reflect the state’s diversity, character, and accomplishments. 
It allows the commission to consult with state, federal, or private 
agencies in developing the process. 
The bill allows the Legislative Management Committee to undertake 
capital expenditure programs to implement this process. As under 
existing law, the committee may do so using capital funds and following 
(1) plans and specifications approved by the commission and (2) state 
bidding laws. 
STATE HISTORICAL COM MISSION 
Membership 
The bill establishes the commission as an independent body within 
the legislative branch for administrative purposes only. Under the bill, 
the commission’s membership consists of the chief court administrator, 
or their designee, the state historian, and 12 appointed members as 
follows: (1) two by the governor and (2) one each by the six legislative 
leaders and the Government Administration and Elections (GAE) 
Committee chairpersons and ranking members. Appointed members 
must be scholars in history, law, literature, or philosophy and affiliated 
with an in-state higher education institution. They may be legislators. 
The bill requires that (1) initial appointments be made by September 
1, 2025, and (2) the first meeting be held by September 15, 2025. 
Members serve three-year terms from their appointment date and 
continue to serve until the appointment of their successors. The 
appointing authority must fill any vacancy, and a vacancy occurring 
during a term must be filled for the rest of the unexpired term. The 
House speaker and Senate president pro tempore must select the 
chairperson, who must schedule the first meeting. A majority of the 
membership constitutes a quorum to transact business.  2025HB-06040-R000550-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: MHF 	Page 3 	4/7/25 
 
The bill requires that commission members serve without 
compensation but allows reimbursement for necessary expenses within 
available funds. 
Powers and Duties 
The bill authorizes the commission to: 
1. issue reports and recommendations to all three branches of 
government on historical questions of memorialization and 
commemoration related to Connecticut and U.S. history, on its 
own initiative or upon request of an agency, department, board, 
or commission in any of the three branches; 
2. obtain assistance and data from these government entities as 
necessary and available to carry out the commission’s purposes; 
3. accept any gift, donation, or bequest to perform its duties; and 
4. perform other acts as may be necessary and appropriate to carry 
out its duties. 
It requires the commission, starting by February 1, 2026, to report 
annually to the governor and GAE Committee. The report must include 
a summary of the commission’s activities during the previous year and 
any policy or legislative changes needed to implement its 
recommendations. Finally, the bill requires the GAE Committee staff to 
serve as the commission’s administrative staff. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Government Administration and Elections Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 13 Nay 6 (03/19/2025)