Connecticut 2025 2025 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06073 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 02/11/2025

                        
 
 
LCO No. 4437   	1 of 4 
 
General Assembly  Committee Bill No. 6073  
January Session, 2025  
LCO No. 4437 
 
 
Referred to Committee on GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(GOS)  
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE PROCESS AND TIMELINE FOR THE 
REVIEW OF EXISTING REGULATIONS OF CONNECTICUT STATE 
AGENCIES. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 4-189i of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2025): 2 
(a) Not later than [July 1, 2017] June 30, 2027, and not later than every 3 
seven years thereafter, each [committee of cognizance, in consultation 4 
with each agency that is within the cognizance of the committee, shall 5 
establish the date by which each such agency shall submit a review of 6 
its existing regulations and shall notify the administrator of the 7 
regulation review committee of each such date and any extension 8 
thereof. In establishing such date, or any extension of the date that may 9 
be requested by the agency, the committee of cognizance (1) shall 10 
consider the volume and complexity of such regulations and the 11 
personnel and other resources of the agency that would be available to 12 
undertake the review within the agency's available appropriations, and 13 
(2) may establish a schedule of dates for the review of various portions 14 
of such regulations upon the agreement of the committee of cognizance 15       
Committee Bill No.  6073 
 
 
LCO No. 4437   	2 of 4 
 
and the administrative head of the agency. 16 
(b) Not later than the date specified by the committee of cognizance 17 
pursuant to subsection (a) of this section, each such agency shall submit 18 
to the committee of cognizance and to the administrator of the 19 
regulation review committee] agency shall conduct a review of its 20 
existing regulations, which shall include, but need not be limited to: (1) 21 
The agency's recommendations on how it may substantially reduce the 22 
number and length of its existing regulations; (2) the agency's 23 
determination of whether each of its existing regulations (A) is obsolete, 24 
(B) has not been used within the preceding seven years, (C) is 25 
inconsistent with any provision of the general statutes, federal law or 26 
any regulation adopted under the general statutes or federal law, (D) 27 
has been the subject of written complaints, and (E) is otherwise no 28 
longer effective; and (3) the agency's recommendation, if any, regarding 29 
any extraordinary circumstances in which waivers from its existing 30 
regulations may be appropriate. 31 
(b) Not later than January 1, 2028, and not later than every seven years 32 
thereafter, each agency shall submit a summary of the results of the 33 
review conducted under subsection (a) of this section to the committee 34 
having cognizance over such agency and to the administrator of the 35 
regulation review committee, in accordance with the provisions of 36 
section 11-4a. 37 
(c) Upon receipt of an agency's review, the committee of cognizance 38 
shall schedule a public hearing, which shall be held not later than ninety 39 
days following such receipt. The committee of cognizance shall make 40 
copies of the review available to the public at least fifteen days prior to 41 
the hearing. 42 
(d) Following the public hearing: (1) The committee of cognizance 43 
may request the agency to initiate the process under chapter 54 to carry 44 
out a recommendation of the agency under subsection [(b)] (a) of this 45 
section to amend or repeal an existing regulation which, in the 46 
determination of the committee of cognizance, does not require the 47       
Committee Bill No.  6073 
 
 
LCO No. 4437   	3 of 4 
 
enactment of authorizing legislation, and (2) the committee of 48 
cognizance shall consider any recommendation by the agency under 49 
subsection [(b)] (a) of this section which, in the determination of the 50 
committee of cognizance, would require the enactment of authorizing 51 
legislation. 52 
(e) If an agency fails to submit a review of its regulations to the 53 
committee of cognizance and the administrator of the regulation review 54 
committee as required by subsection (b) of this section or if the 55 
committee of cognizance determines that the agency has not conducted 56 
a satisfactory review of its regulations as required by said subsection, 57 
the committee of cognizance may: (1) Conduct a review of the existing 58 
regulations of the agency, as described in subsection [(b)] (a) of this 59 
section, (2) request the agency to initiate the process under chapter 54 to 60 
carry out a recommendation of the committee of cognizance pursuant 61 
to such review to amend or repeal an existing regulation which, in the 62 
determination of the committee of cognizance, does not require the 63 
enactment of authorizing legislation, and (3) introduce legislation to 64 
authorize the agency to amend or repeal existing regulations. If the 65 
agency fails to initiate the process to amend or repeal an existing 66 
regulation pursuant to subdivision (2) of this subsection, the committee 67 
of cognizance may introduce legislation requiring the agency to initiate 68 
such process. 69 
Sec. 2. Subdivision (3) of section 4-189h of the general statutes is 70 
repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 71 
1, 2025): 72 
(3) "Existing regulation" means a regulation that was adopted by an 73 
agency no later than one year prior to the scheduled date of review, as 74 
provided in subsection [(b)] (a) of section 4-189i, as amended by this act; 75 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 October 1, 2025 4-189i       
Committee Bill No.  6073 
 
 
LCO No. 4437   	4 of 4 
 
Sec. 2 October 1, 2025 4-189h(3) 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To make modifications to the process for reviewing agency regulations 
to determine whether they are obsolete, inconsistent or ineffective and 
change the deadlines for such review. 
 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except 
that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not 
underlined.] 
 
Co-Sponsors:  REP. DATHAN, 142nd Dist.  
 
H.B. 6073