Connecticut 2025 2025 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06073 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/12/2025

                     
Researcher: MHF 	Page 1 	3/12/25 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 6073  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE PROCESS AND TIMELINE FOR THE 
REVIEW OF EXISTING REGULATIONS OF CONNECTICUT STATE 
AGENCIES.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill transfers responsibility for conducting periodic reviews of a 
state agency’s existing regulations from the legislative committee of 
cognizance to the state agency itself. Under current law, each legislative 
committee, at least every seven years, must consult with state agencies 
within its cognizance to establish a date the agency will submit a review 
of its existing regulations to the committee. Committees must notify the 
Regulation Review Committee administrator of these dates and any 
extensions approved by the committee of cognizance. 
The bill eliminates these provisions and instead requires each agency 
to conduct these reviews by June 30, 2027, submit a summary of its 
review by June 30, 2028, and then do so again at least every seven years. 
The summary must be submitted to the committee of cognizance and 
the Regulation Review Committee administrator. 
As under existing law, the agency’s review must at least include (1) 
recommendations for reducing regulations’ number and length; (2) 
determinations on whether they are obsolete, unused, inconsistent with 
other laws, no longer effective, or the subject of written complaints; and 
(3) recommendations on extraordinary circumstances warranting their 
waiver. 
Finally, the bill also makes technical and conforming changes. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: October 1, 2025 
ACTION ON AGENCY REV IEWS 
The bill generally maintains the existing provisions for conducting  2025HB-06073-R000080-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: MHF 	Page 2 	3/12/25 
 
public hearings on agency reviews and acting on agency 
recommendations. 
Current law requires that upon receiving a review from an agency, 
the committee of cognizance must hold a public hearing on the review 
within 90 days of receiving it. The bill instead requires this after 
receiving the summary. The committee must make copies of the 
submission publicly available at least 15 days before the hearing.  
Following the hearing, the committee may ask the agency to proceed 
in amending or repealing any regulations within its authority through 
the Uniform Administrative Procedures Act (UAPA). The committee 
must also consider recommendations that require legislative 
authorization in the committee’s opinion. 
If an agency fails to submit a summary, or the committee deems an 
agency’s review unsatisfactory, the committee may:  
1. conduct its own review;  
2. ask the agency, within its authority, to initiate proceedings under 
UAPA to implement the committee’s recommendations; and  
3. introduce legislation to authorize the agency to amend or repeal 
existing regulations (presumably outside the agency’s current 
authority).  
If the agency fails to initiate the proceedings, the committee may 
introduce legislation requiring an agency to commence this process. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Government Oversight Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 9 Nay 0 (02/25/2025)