Connecticut 2025 2025 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06074 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/01/2025

                     
Researcher: ST 	Page 1 	4/1/25 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 6074  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE STUDENT LOAN REIMBURSEMENT 
PROGRAM.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill makes various changes to the Office of Higher Education’s 
(OHE) student loan reimbursement program, including: 
1. expanding eligibility to former Stone Academy students; and 
2. changing the volunteer hour requirement by adding new ways 
to earn volunteer hours, requiring OHE to develop a volunteer 
hour hardship waiver, and adding new provisions on service 
documentation. 
The bill also makes technical and grammatical changes.  
The student loan reimbursement program was created in 2023 and 
launched in January of 2025. Eligible participants are reimbursed for up 
to $5,000 of their student loan payments per year (for up to four years)  
EFFECTIVE DATE: July 1, 2025 
ELIGIBILITY EXPANSION 
The bill extends student loan reimbursement eligibility to include 
individuals who were enrolled in Stone Academy’s practical nurse 
education program between November 1, 2021, and February 28, 2023. 
(Stone Academy closed suddenly in early 2023. At the time of the 
school’s closure, there were students midway through their practical 
nurse education program.) 
In current law, there is a general requirement that to qualify for 
student loan reimbursement, participants must have earned an associate 
or bachelor’s degree from a Connecticut institution of higher education 
(or meet a licensure or hardship requirement). The bill allows these  2025HB-06074-R000391-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: ST 	Page 2 	4/1/25 
 
former Stone Academy students to qualify for reimbursement 
regardless of whether they graduated with a degree from the program.  
By law, all participants are required to meet two additional criteria to 
qualify for student loan reimbursement: (1) Connecticut residency for at 
least five years, and (2) an income below a set threshold.  
VOLUNTEER HOURS REQUIREMENT 
Eligible Volunteer Work  
Under current law, participants in the student loan reimbursement 
program must have at least 50 volunteer hours (generally for a nonprofit 
organization or municipal government) for each year they participate. 
The bill makes various changes to the scope of eligible volunteer work, 
including: 
1. expanding the eligible nonprofit organizations the participants 
can volunteer for to all tax-exempt nonprofits and not just those 
registered with the Department of Consumer Protection; 
2. specifically adding the U.S. armed forces as an eligible entity to 
volunteer for (existing law already includes military service as an 
eligible type of volunteer work);  
3. specifying that volunteering as a firefighter, emergency medical 
personnel, or for a religious organization are eligible ways to 
meet the service requirement; 
4. adding unpaid work that was required to complete any 
certificate or degree program to count as eligible volunteer hours 
(these work hours are only eligible for two years after completion 
or for the first two years of program participation, whichever is 
later); and 
5. specifying that an individual can combine hours from more than 
one eligible organization to meet the volunteer service 
requirement. 
  2025HB-06074-R000391-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: ST 	Page 3 	4/1/25 
 
Hardship Waiver  
The bill also requires OHE to establish a waiver to exempt program 
participants from the volunteer hour requirement. OHE must post the 
eligibility requirements and application forms for the waiver by January 
1, 2026. Under the bill, individuals who were enrolled in the practical 
nurse education program at Stone Academy between November 1, 2021, 
and February 28, 2023, automatically qualify for the waiver.  
Service Documentation  
By law, participants must annually submit a form to OHE with the 
number of volunteer hours completed. This form must be signed by a 
supervisor or other employee of the eligible entity the participant 
volunteered for.  
The bill specifies that for documenting military service or unpaid 
student work volunteer hours, OHE can accept other documentation 
outside what is required by existing law. The bill also removes the 
requirement that for military service, the form be signed by the 
participant’s commanding officer.  
Additionally, for documenting volunteer hours at nonprofit 
organizations, the bill requires the participant to submit evidence of 
current nonprofit certification from the Internal Revenue Service.  
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 16 Nay 2 (03/13/2025)