Connecticut 2025 2025 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06180 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 01/29/2025

                        
 
 
LCO No. 3902   	1 of 4 
 
General Assembly  Committee Bill No. 6180  
January Session, 2025  
LCO No. 3902 
 
 
Referred to Committee on COMMITTEE ON CHILDREN  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(KID)  
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING NOTICE OF FIREARMS BY OPERATORS OF 
FAMILY CHILD CARE HOMES. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2025) (a) For the purposes of this 1 
section, "firearm" has the same meaning as provided in section 53a-3 of 2 
the general statutes. 3 
(b) Not later than January 1, 2026, and annually thereafter, each 4 
operator of a family child care home licensed pursuant to section 19a-5 
97b of the general statutes, in which one or more firearms is stored, shall 6 
provide written notification of the presence of each such firearm to the 7 
parent or guardian of each child enrolled in such home. Such 8 
notification shall (1) include a list of the number and type of each firearm 9 
stored in such home, and (2) require such parent or guardian to 10 
acknowledge receipt of such notification by providing such parent or 11 
guardian's signature. On and after January 1, 2027, such written 12 
notification shall be provided to the parent or guardian of each child 13 
enrolling in any such home for the first time. Such operator shall 14 
maintain each signed acknowledgment of receipt for not less than three 15 
years, and make such signed acknowledgments available to the Office 16       
Committee Bill No.  6180 
 
 
LCO No. 3902   	2 of 4 
 
of Early Childhood for inspection upon request. 17 
(c) Not later than February 1, 2027, and annually thereafter, each 18 
operator of a family child care home in which one or more firearms is 19 
stored shall, in a form and manner prescribed by the Commissioner of 20 
Early Childhood, confirm compliance with the provisions of subsection 21 
(b) of this section during the preceding calendar year. 22 
Sec. 2. Subsection (a) of section 19a-87e of the general statutes is 23 
repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 24 
2025): 25 
(a) The Commissioner of Early Childhood may (1) refuse to license 26 
under section 19a-87b, a person to own, conduct, operate or maintain a 27 
family child care home, as defined in section 19a-77, (2) refuse to 28 
approve under section 19a-87b, a person to act as an assistant or 29 
substitute staff member in a family child care home, as defined in section 30 
19a-77, or (3) suspend or revoke the license or approval or take any other 31 
action that may be set forth in regulation that may be adopted pursuant 32 
to section 19a-79 if the person who owns, conducts, maintains or 33 
operates the family child care home, the person who acts as an assistant 34 
or substitute staff member in a family child care home, a person 35 
employed in such family child care home in a position connected with 36 
the provision of care to a child receiving child care services or a 37 
household member, as defined in subsection (c) of section 19a-87b, who 38 
is sixteen years of age or older and resides therein, has been convicted, 39 
in this state or any other state of a felony, as defined in section 53a-25, 40 
involving the use, attempted use or threatened use of physical force 41 
against another person, or has a criminal record in this state or any other 42 
state that the commissioner reasonably believes renders the person 43 
unsuitable to own, conduct, operate or maintain or be employed by a 44 
family child care home, or act as an assistant or substitute staff member 45 
in a family child care home, or if such persons or a household member 46 
has been convicted in this state or any other state of cruelty to persons 47 
under section 53-20, injury or risk of injury to or impairing morals of 48       
Committee Bill No.  6180 
 
 
LCO No. 3902   	3 of 4 
 
children under section 53-21, abandonment of children under the age of 49 
six years under section 53-23, or any felony where the victim of the 50 
felony is a child under eighteen years of age, a violation of section 53a-51 
70b of the general statutes, revision of 1958, revised to January 1, 2019, 52 
or section 53a-70, 53a-70a, 53a-71, 53a-72a, 53a-72b or 53a-73a, illegal 53 
manufacture, distribution, sale, prescription, dispensing or 54 
administration under section 21a-277 or 21a-278, or illegal possession 55 
under section 21a-279, or if such person, a person who acts as assistant 56 
or substitute staff member in a family child care home or a person 57 
employed in such family child care home in a position connected with 58 
the provision of care to a child receiving child care services, either fails 59 
to substantially comply with the regulations adopted pursuant to 60 
section 19a-87b, or conducts, operates or maintains the home in a 61 
manner which endangers the health, safety and welfare of the children 62 
receiving child care services, including, but not limited to, failure to 63 
comply with the provisions of section 1 of this act. Any refusal of a 64 
license or approval pursuant to this section shall be rendered in 65 
accordance with the provisions of sections 46a-79 to 46a-81, inclusive. 66 
Any person whose license or approval has been revoked pursuant to 67 
this section shall be ineligible to apply for a license or approval for a 68 
period of one year from the effective date of revocation. 69 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2025 New section 
Sec. 2 July 1, 2025 19a-87e(a) 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To require (1) family child care home operators to notify parents and 
guardians of the presence of firearms, and (2) the Office of Early 
Childhood to take adverse licensing action against operators for 
violation of said requirement. 
       
Committee Bill No.  6180 
 
 
LCO No. 3902   	4 of 4 
 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except 
that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not 
underlined.] 
 
Co-Sponsors:  REP. LINEHAN, 103rd Dist.  
 
H.B. 6180