Connecticut 2025 2025 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06180 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/03/2025

                     
Researcher: JM 	Page 1 	3/3/25 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 6180  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING NOTICE OF FIREARMS BY OPERATORS 
OF FAMILY CHILD CARE HOMES.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires family child care home operators to annually notify 
parents and guardians in writing if there are firearms in the home, 
starting by January 1, 2026 (see BACKGROUND).  
Under the bill, the written notice must require a parent or guardian 
to acknowledge receipt by signing it. The home operator must (1) keep 
these acknowledgments for at least three years, (2) make them available 
for inspection by the Office of Early Childhood (OEC) upon request, and 
(3) annually report compliance with these requirements to OEC. 
The bill authorizes OEC to suspend or revoke the family child care 
home license or take other allowed action against an operator who 
violates the above requirements. 
Family child care homes are private homes that provide care for up 
to six children who are not in school full-time and up to three additional 
children who are in school full-time. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: July 1, 2025 
NOTIFICATION AND RELATED REQUIREMENTS 
Under the bill, starting by January 1, 2026, family child care home 
operators with a firearm stored in the home must annually give parents 
and guardians written notification of its presence. The notice must (1) 
list of the number and type of each firearm in the home and (2) require 
that a parent or guardian sign the notice to acknowledge receipt. 
Beginning January 1, 2026, the operators must also give the notice to 
a parent or guardian of each child enrolling in the home for the first  2025HB-06180-R000031-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JM 	Page 2 	3/3/25 
 
time.  
Beginning by February 1, 2027, each operator of a family child care 
home in which firearms are kept must annually confirm with the OEC 
commissioner compliance with the bill’s provisions for the previous 
calendar year on a form she prescribes. 
Existing regulations require the OEC annual inspection to check for 
secure storage of guns, weapons, and ammunition (Conn. Agencies 
Regs., § 19a-87b-9).  
ENFORCEMENT 
The bill authorizes the OEC commissioner to suspend or revoke the 
family child care home license or take other allowed action against 
operators who violate the notification or related requirements.  
By law, one way that a license can be suspended or revoked is if the 
operator conducts, operates, or maintains the home in a way that 
endangers the health, safety, and welfare of the children receiving child 
care services. The bill specifies that this type of endangerment includes 
failure to comply with the firearms notification and related 
requirements. 
By law, a license can also be suspended or revoked for a number of 
criminal convictions, including (1) a felony involving the use or 
threatened use of physical force, (2) injury or risk of injury or impairing 
the morals of a minor, (3) abandonment of children under the age of 6, 
or (4) any felony where the victim is a child under 18 years old. 
Under OEC regulations, after a case hearing, OEC can suspend, 
revoke, or place a license on probationary status and impose conditions 
or require corrective measures that it deems necessary (Conn. Agencies 
Regs., § 19a-87b-15).  
BACKGROUND 
Firearm 
By law, a firearm is any shotgun or sawed-off shotgun, machine gun, 
rifle, pistol, revolver, or other weapon, whether loaded or unloaded that  2025HB-06180-R000031-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JM 	Page 3 	3/3/25 
 
may discharge a shot (CGS § 53a-3(19)). 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Committee on Children 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 11 Nay 6 (02/18/2025)