Connecticut 2025 2025 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06185 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 01/29/2025

                        
 
 
LCO No. 3885   	1 of 3 
 
General Assembly  Committee Bill No. 6185  
January Session, 2025  
LCO No. 3885 
 
 
Referred to Committee on COMMITTEE ON CHILDREN  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(KID)  
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE CONSUMPTION OF ENERGY DRINKS BY 
CHILDREN. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (Effective from passage) (a) For the purposes of this section, 1 
"energy drink" means a soft drink that contains (1) not less than eighty 2 
milligrams of caffeine per nine fluid ounces, and (2) methylxanthines, B 3 
vitamins, one or more herbal ingredients or an ingredient labeled 4 
"energy blend", and "social media" has the same meaning as provided 5 
in section 9-601 of the general statutes. 6 
(b) There is established a working group to (1) study the (A) medical 7 
risks associated with energy drink consumption by children, and (B) 8 
anticipated effects of a prohibition on the sale of energy drinks to 9 
children on (i) the state-wide sale of energy drinks, and (ii) public health, 10 
and (2) make recommendations for (A) a public awareness campaign 11 
concerning such risks that includes, but is not limited to, a video 12 
recording for publication or broadcast on television and social media, 13 
(B) notice to be posted at the point of sale of energy drinks in retail 14 
establishments alerting consumers to such risks, and (C) a one-page 15 
document explaining such risks. 16       
Committee Bill No.  6185 
 
 
LCO No. 3885   	2 of 3 
 
(c) The working group shall include, but not be limited to, the 17 
following members, who shall be selected jointly by the Commissioners 18 
of Public Health and Consumer Protection: (1) The chairpersons and 19 
ranking members of the joint standing committees of the General 20 
Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to children and public 21 
health, (2) an individual with expertise in advertising and marketing, (3) 22 
a parent or guardian of a child who experienced adverse health 23 
conditions or died due to the consumption of energy drinks, (4) a 24 
pediatric cardiologist, (5) a representative of a state-wide chapter of a 25 
national association of pediatricians, (6) a representative of a state-wide 26 
governing body for interscholastic athletic activities, (7) a representative 27 
of the Connecticut Children's Medical Center, (8) a representative of a 28 
state-wide association of food retailers, wholesalers, distributors and 29 
service providers, (9) a representative of a manufacturer of energy 30 
drinks, (10) the Commissioner of Public Health, or the commissioner's 31 
designee, and (11) a licensed athletic trainer. The commissioners, or their 32 
designees, shall serve as cochairpersons of the working group. The 33 
administrative staff of the joint standing committee of the General 34 
Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to children shall serve 35 
as administrative staff of the working group. 36 
(d) Not later than November 1, 2025, the working group shall submit 37 
a report on its study and recommendations to the joint standing 38 
committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters 39 
relating to children, public health and consumer protection in 40 
accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes. 41 
Sec. 2. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2025) (a) For the purposes of this 42 
section, "energy drink" means a soft drink that contains (1) not less than 43 
eighty milligrams of caffeine per nine fluid ounces, and (2) 44 
methylxanthines, B vitamins, one or more herbal ingredients or an 45 
ingredient labeled "energy blend". 46 
(b) Not later than December 1, 2025, the Department of Consumer 47 
Protection shall develop signage alerting consumers to the medical risks 48       
Committee Bill No.  6185 
 
 
LCO No. 3885   	3 of 3 
 
associated with energy drink consumption by children and make a copy 49 
of such signage available on the department's Internet web site. Such 50 
signage shall incorporate the recommendations submitted by the 51 
working group established pursuant to section 1 of this act. 52 
(c) On and after January 1, 2026, each individual, firm, fiduciary, 53 
partnership, corporation, limited liability company, trust or association 54 
engaged in the business of selling energy drinks to retail consumers in 55 
the state shall post a copy of the notice developed pursuant to subsection 56 
(b) of this section in a conspicuous place at the point of sale of such 57 
energy drinks. 58 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 from passage New section 
Sec. 2 July 1, 2025 New section 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To establish a working group to study the medical risks associated with 
the consumption of energy drinks by children and effects of a 
prohibition on the sale of energy drinks to children, and require signage 
related to the medical risks associated with the consumption of energy 
drinks by children. 
 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except 
that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not 
underlined.] 
 
Co-Sponsors:  REP. LINEHAN, 103rd Dist.  
 
H.B. 6185