Connecticut 2025 2025 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06231 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/16/2025

                     
Researcher: JKL 	Page 1 	4/16/25 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 6231  
 
AN ACT RESTRICTING THE EUTHANIZATION OF FERAL CATS, 
PROHIBITING CERTAIN EMPLOYMENT AS AN ANIMAL CONTROL 
OFFICER AND STUDYING THE INVOLVEMENT OF OUTSIDE 
ORGANIZATIONS AT ANIMAL CONTROL FACILITIES.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill makes a number of unrelated changes regarding animal 
control officers (ACOs), cats, and animal rescue organizations. 
First, the bill prohibits a person from being a municipal or regional 
ACO if he or she is convicted of animal abuse or neglect or enters a no 
contest plea or plea bargain on such a charge (§ 2). Under existing law, 
if convicted, a person cannot, for five years (and in addition to any other 
sentence imposed), (1) harbor, own, possess, reside with, adopt, or serve 
as a foster placement for any animal or (2) be employed by, or volunteer 
for, any entity in any position that involves care for, or regular contact 
with, any animal (CGS § 53-247(f)). 
The bill prohibits a municipality or its ACO from euthanizing a feral 
cat for any reason except for when the cat (1) poses a public health 
danger or (2) is so injured that a Connecticut-licensed veterinarian 
decides euthanasia is the only humane action. It requires ACOs to 
consult an animal rescue organization when trying to control the feral 
cat population in a municipality, and it revises the allowed subject of 
municipal ordinances on cat ownership generally (§ 1). It also repeals 
the law that permits ACOs to impound and dispose of certain cats (§ 4). 
Lastly, the bill requires the Department of Agriculture (DoAg) 
commissioner to convene a working group to develop legislative 
recommendations for various things, including shortening the length of 
time seized animals are kept in custody at the animal control facilities 
and protocols for using volunteers in the facilities. The commissioner 
must report recommendations to the Environment Committee by  2025HB-06231-R000716-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JKL 	Page 2 	4/16/25 
 
February 1, 2026 (§ 3). 
EFFECTIVE DATE: Upon passage, except that the provision 
prohibiting someone convicted of animal abuse or neglect from being 
an ACO is effective October 1, 2025. 
§§ 1 & 4 — LOCAL ACTIONS INVOLV ING CATS 
Euthanizing Feral Cats 
The bill prohibits a municipality or a municipal or regional ACO from 
euthanizing a feral cat for any reason other than the cat (1) poses a public 
health danger (e.g., has a communicable disease, including rabies) or (2) 
is so injured that a Connecticut-licensed veterinarian decides euthanasia 
is the only humane course of action. By law, a “feral cat” is a free-
roaming domestic cat that is not owned. 
Animal Rescue Organization Consult About Feral Cats 
The bill requires an ACO to consult an animal rescue or feral cat 
organization when trying to control the feral cat population in a 
municipality. The consult is to possibly place feral cats with the 
organization. 
Municipal Ordinances on Cats Generally 
By law, municipalities may adopt ordinances prohibiting anyone 
from owning or keeping a cat that (1) substantially damages someone 
else’s property or (2) causes an unsanitary, dangerous, or unreasonably 
offensive condition. The bill eliminates the “unreasonably offensive 
condition” element from the permissible ordinances. By law, a violation 
of such an ordinance is an infraction. 
Repealed Section on Impounding and Disposing of Certain Cats 
The bill repeals a current law that, among other things: 
1. allows an ACO for a municipality that has adopted an ordinance 
about cats generally to impound cats that are damaging another’s 
property or causing an unsanitary, dangerous, or unreasonably 
offensive condition;  
2. requires the ACO to notify the cat’s owner or keeper, if known,  2025HB-06231-R000716-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JKL 	Page 3 	4/16/25 
 
about its impoundment or publish notice in a local newspaper;  
3. makes it an infraction not to collect a cat one owns or keeps after 
receiving notice that the ACO impounded it; 
4. allows the ACO, if the cat is not claimed by its owner within 
seven days, to have a veterinarian spay or neuter the cat and sell 
the cat as a pet; and  
5. requires the ACO to have the cat mercifully killed if it remains 
unclaimed.  
§ 3 — WORKING GROUP 
Charge 
The bill requires the DoAg commissioner, by July 1, 2025, to convene 
a seven-member working group within the department to develop 
legislative recommendations on the following: 
1. guidelines and best practices for animal rescue organizations and 
the public to provide mutual aid to animal control and dog 
pound facilities, 
2. ways to shorten the length of time seized animals are kept in 
custody at the facilities, 
3. ways to improve ACO training through enhanced continuing 
education requirements, and 
4. protocols for using volunteers in animal control facilities.  
Membership 
The working group consists of the DoAg commissioner and the chief 
state’s attorney, or their designees, and five members the DoAg 
commissioner appoints, as follows: 
1. three representatives of an organization representing ACOs that 
represent, respectively, urban, suburban, and rural 
municipalities;  2025HB-06231-R000716-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JKL 	Page 4 	4/16/25 
 
2. a municipal police department representative; and  
3. an animal rights organization representative.  
Public Forums and Report 
The bill requires the (1) working group to hold at least two public 
forums and (2) commissioner to report the group’s recommendations to 
the Environment Committee by February 1, 2026. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Environment Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 31 Nay 2 (03/28/2025)