Connecticut 2025 2025 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06327 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 02/05/2025

                        
 
 
LCO No. 4432   	1 of 2 
 
General Assembly  Committee Bill No. 6327  
January Session, 2025  
LCO No. 4432 
 
 
Referred to Committee on GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(GOS)  
 
 
 
AN ACT REQUIRING THE SECRETARY OF THE OFFICE OF POLICY 
AND MANAGEMENT TO SUBMIT AN ANNUAL REPORT 
CONCERNING STATE CONTRACTS AWARDED TO OUT -OF-STATE 
BUSINESSES. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 4-67i of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2025): 2 
(a) Not later than January 1, 2020, and every three years thereafter, 3 
each state agency, as defined in section 4-212, shall submit to the 4 
Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management for approval an 5 
agency procurement plan that includes, but is not limited to, a list of all 6 
services and programs the agency intends to contract for over the three-7 
year period next succeeding such report, and a planned schedule of 8 
procurements indicating whether such procurements shall be based on 9 
competitive negotiation or competitive quotations, or whether the state 10 
agency has determined that a sole source purchase of services is 11 
required and the agency intends to apply to the secretary for a waiver 12 
in accordance with the guidelines adopted under section 4-216. 13 
(b) As used in this subsection, "resident business" means a business 14       
Committee Bill No.  6327 
 
 
LCO No. 4432   	2 of 2 
 
whose principal place of business is located inside of this state and 15 
"nonresident business" means a business whose principal place of 16 
business is located outside of this state. Not later than December 1, 2025, 17 
and annually thereafter, each state agency, as defined in section 4-212, 18 
shall report to the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management all 19 
contracts awarded to nonresident businesses, including for each such 20 
contract whether any resident businesses bid on such contract and the 21 
reasons why the state agency selected a nonresident business in lieu of 22 
a resident business, if applicable. The initial report shall include all 23 
contracts awarded on or after July 1, 2025, and subsequent reports shall 24 
include all contracts awarded since the date of the immediately 25 
preceding report. Not later than January 1, 2026, and annually 26 
thereafter, the secretary shall compile all such reports received and 27 
submit a summary, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a, 28 
to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having 29 
cognizance of matters relating to government oversight. 30 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2025 4-67i 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To require the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management to 
submit an annual report concerning any state contracts awarded to out-
of-state businesses. 
 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except 
that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not 
underlined.] 
 
Co-Sponsors:  REP. CARNEY, 23rd Dist.  
 
H.B. 6327