Connecticut 2025 2025 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB07041 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/24/2025

                     
Researcher: KLM 	Page 1 	4/24/25 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
HB 7041  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE COMPOSITION OF THE JUDICIAL 
SELECTION COMMISSION AND DECISIONS RENDERED BY SAID 
COMMISSION.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill changes the composition of the 12-member Judicial Selection 
Commission. It ends the terms of the current members on December 31, 
2025, and requires a new commission be appointed beginning January 
1, 2026. Under current law, the commission is made up of six attorneys 
and six non-attorneys. Under the bill, the new commission is made up 
of eight attorneys, who each have engaged in the practice of law in 
Connecticut for at least 10 years, and four non-attorneys.  
The bill also makes changes to the commission’s operations, as 
follows: 
1. limits the time a candidate may be included on the commission’s 
list of qualified candidates to 10 years; 
2. increases, from two to three years, the time a commission 
member who is an attorney has to wait after ending his or her 
commission tenure before being considered for a judicial 
nomination; 
3. requires the commission, when denying a recommendation for 
judicial nomination, to include in its decision a brief summary of 
the reasons for the denial; and 
4. requires the commission, in its annual report to the Judiciary 
Committee, to include the areas of professional experience for 
individuals on the list of qualified candidates and for those who 
were interviewed, recommended, and denied recommendation. 
The bill also makes technical and conforming changes.  2025HB-07041-R000765-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: KLM 	Page 2 	4/24/25 
 
EFFECTIVE DATE: July 1, 2025 
JUDICIAL SELECTION COMMISSION MEMBERS 
Membership 
The bill ends the terms of the commission’s current members on 
December 31, 2025. However, a member serving on that date who meets 
the new qualifications may be reappointed to the newly formed 
commission for an additional consecutive term, which must end three 
years after the member’s original appointment.  
The appointments to the commission under current law and the bill, 
including specified qualifications, are in the table below. 
Table: Judicial Selection Commission Appointees 
Appointing 
Authority 
Until December 31, 2025, 
Under Current Law 
Beginning January 1, 2026, 
Under the Bill 
Governor Six members: 
One from each congressional 
district and one at-large as 
follows: 
Three attorneys and three non-
attorneys 
Six members: 
One from each congressional 
district and one at-large as 
follows: 
Two attorneys who have 
engaged in the practice of law in 
Connecticut for at least 10 years 
and four non-attorneys 
Senate president pro 
tempore 
One attorney 
For each, one attorney who has 
engaged in the practice of law in 
Connecticut for at least 10 years 
House speaker One non-attorney 
Senate majority 
leader 
One non-attorney 
House majority leader One attorney 
Senate minority 
leader 
One non-attorney 
House minority leader One attorney 
 
As under existing law, no more than six of the members may belong 
to the same political party, and none may otherwise be an elected or 
appointed state official or hold statewide office in a political party. 
As under current law, members must select a chairperson from 
among the governor’s appointees. They must serve (1) a three-year term 
and (2) until a successor is appointed and qualified, but no later than 90  2025HB-07041-R000765-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: KLM 	Page 3 	4/24/25 
 
days after their term ends. 
LIST OF JUDICIAL CANDIDATES 
By law, the commission maintains a list of qualified candidates, 
including judges seeking appointment to a different court, for the 
governor’s consideration for nomination as a judge in the state’s 
Superior, Appellate, and Supreme courts. The bill limits the time a 
candidate may remain on the list to no more than 10 years.  
Under current law, a commission member who is an attorney cannot 
be considered for a recommendation to the governor during the 
member’s tenure or for two years following. The bill increases this 
period to three years following the end of the member’s commission 
tenure. 
Additionally, if the commission decides to deny a recommendation 
to a candidate, the bill requires that its decision include a brief summary 
of the reasons for the denial. The commission must determine the form 
and manner of the statement.  
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Judiciary Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 41 Nay 0 (04/07/2025)