Connecticut 2025 2025 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB07141 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/28/2025

                     
Researcher: AS 	Page 1 	4/28/25 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 7141  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING COMPENSATION PAID TO INJURED 
EMPLOYEES AND THE PARENTS OF A DECEASED EMPLOYEE 
UNDER THE WORKERS' COMPENSATION ACT.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill makes various changes to workers’ compensation benefits 
and related services. 
It removes an administrative law judge’s (ALJ) discretion to award 
temporary partial incapacity benefits instead of permanent, partial 
disability (PPD) benefits once an injured employee reaches maximum 
medical improvement (see BACKGROUND) . Generally, temporary 
partial incapacity benefits are 75% of the difference between the 
employee’s net (after tax and Social Security deductions) regular wage 
and what he or she earns by working at a reduced capacity, but they 
may be up to 75% of the employee’s net regular wage if the employee 
cannot find suitable employment. PPD benefits vary, and are for the 
permanent, partial reduction in function or loss of a body part (see 
BACKGROUND ). 
The bill increases the duration of PPD benefits for a cervical spine 
injury that an injured worker may receive from 117 to 208 weeks as of 
July 1, 2025. Starting on that date, the bill also expands the list of injuries 
eligible for PPD benefits to include the: 
1. intestinal tract (347 weeks), 
2. esophagus (180 weeks), 
3. trachea (117 weeks), 
4. larynx (117 weeks), and 
5. diaphragm (117 weeks).  2025HB-07141-R000784-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: AS 	Page 2 	4/28/25 
 
The bill also allows a deceased employee’s parents, when there are no 
dependents for distribution of workers’ compensation benefits, to each 
receive an equal portion of the benefits.  
Lastly, the bill establishes a working group to study rehabilitation 
services available to injured employees under the state’s Workers’ 
Compensation Act. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: Upon passage  
ELIGIBILITY FOR DIFFERENT TYPES OF BENEFITS 
The bill requires an ALJ to award PPD benefits to an injured 
employee who is eligible for them. It removes the ALJ’s discretion to 
instead award temporary partial incapacity benefits. Under existing 
law, the right to PPD benefits begins after the employee reaches 
maximum medical improvement for the injury (CGS § 31-295(c)). 
Under the bill, if these employees reach maximum medical 
improvement but their injuries continue to result in total incapacity to 
work, they remain eligible to receive total incapacity benefits until the 
period of total incapacity ends. 
These provisions apply to any matter (1) filed with the Workers’ 
Compensation Commission on or after July 1, 1993, that is open and 
pending before the commission when the bill passes or (2) filed with the 
commission on or after the bill passes. 
COMPENSATION UPON AN EMPLOYEE’S DEATH 
Under existing law, when employees with no presumptive 
dependents (such as a spouse or minor children) die due to a work-
related accident, anyone who was wholly dependent in fact upon them 
may receive their workers’ compensation benefits. In cases where there 
are no such dependents, the bill allows for these benefits to be divided 
equally among the deceased employee’s parents. 
Under existing law, and unchanged by the bill, these benefits may be 
paid for up to 312 weeks from the employee’s death. Survivors who 
were wholly dependent in fact must be paid the full benefit rate, and  2025HB-07141-R000784-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: AS 	Page 3 	4/28/25 
 
benefits for those partially dependent in fact must be at least $20 per 
week, but no more than the (1) full benefit rate or (2) average weekly 
amount that the deceased contributed to their support. (The bill does 
not specify the benefit rate for parents.) 
WORKING GROUP 
The bill establishes a working group to study rehabilitation services 
available to injured employees under the state’s Workers’ 
Compensation Act. Under the bill, the working group must at least 
examine:  
1. whether the act’s provisions adequately fund rehabilitation 
services for all injured employees and  
2. ways to encourage injured employees to use these services 
(including providing stipends to injured employees who use the 
services). 
Members 
The bill requires the working group to include the following 
members, or their designees: 
1. the Judiciary Committee chairpersons and ranking members,  
2. the Aging and Disability Services commissioner, and 
3. the Workers’ Compensation Commission chairperson. 
The group also includes the following seven members, jointly 
appointed by the Judiciary Committee chairpersons:  
1. an attorney with expertise in representing claimants appearing 
before the Workers’ Compensation Commission,  
2. an attorney with expertise in representing respondents 
appearing before the commission,  
3. a representative of an association representing attorneys in the 
state,   2025HB-07141-R000784-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: AS 	Page 4 	4/28/25 
 
4. a representative of an association representing trial attorneys in 
the state,  
5. a representative of an association representing workers’ 
compensation insurers in the state, 
6. a representative of an association representing business and 
industry in the state, and  
7. a representative of a labor organization. 
Under the bill, all initial appointments must be made within 30 days 
after the bill passes. Any vacancies must be filled by the appointing 
authority.  
Leadership and Meetings 
The bill makes the Judiciary Committee chairpersons, or their 
designees, the working group’s chairpersons. Under the bill, they must 
schedule and hold the group’s first meeting within 60 days after the bill 
passes. The working group must meet at least once per month and at 
other times as the chairpersons deem necessary. 
The bill requires the Judiciary Committee’s administrative staff to 
serve in this capacity for the working group. 
Reporting Requirement 
Under the bill, the working group must report on its findings and 
recommendations to the Judiciary Committee by February 1, 2026. The 
working group must end when it submits its report or on February 1, 
2026, whichever is later. 
BACKGROUND 
Permanent, Partial Disability Benefits 
By law, PPD benefits are for the permanent, partial reduction in 
function or loss of a body part. The worker receives PPD benefits based 
on the disability rating (a physician’s determination of the percentage of 
the body part that is disabled), the weeks of compensation provided for 
that body part specified in the law, and the employee’s basic  2025HB-07141-R000784-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: AS 	Page 5 	4/28/25 
 
compensation rate. By law, the weeks of compensation range from one 
(tooth) to 520 (heart, brain, or carotid artery) depending on the body 
part. 
Related Case 
In March 2025, the Connecticut Supreme Court ruled in Gardner v. 
Dept. of Mental Health & Addiction Services that Connecticut law gives an 
ALJ discretion to award a workers’ compensation claimant, after they 
reach maximum medical improvement, ongoing temporary partial 
incapacity benefits (up to the statutory maximum of 520 weeks) rather 
than PPD benefits.  
Related Bill 
HB 6408 (File 302), favorably reported by the Labor and Public 
Employees Committee, allows surviving family members of an 
employee to receive compensation for a work-related death when the 
employee does not have dependents. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Judiciary Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 39 Nay 0 (04/10/2025)