Connecticut 2025 2025 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01115 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/14/2025

                     
Researcher: DD 	Page 1 	4/14/25 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
SB 1115  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING ENFORCEMENT OF CROSS	-BORDER 
BOTTLE REDEMPTION PROHIBITIONS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill makes a number of changes to the state’s beverage container 
redemption law (“bottle bill”) that expand the state’s oversight and 
enforcement of redemption centers. Principally, the bill: 
1. requires redemption centers to be approved by, and annually 
register with, the Department of Revenue Services (DRS), rather 
than register once with the Department of Energy and 
Environmental Protection (DEEP) as current law requires, and 
expands the information they must provide as part of their 
registration process; 
2. requires redemption centers that accept more than 1,200 
containers from any one person in one day to record certain 
identifying information about that person;  
3. adds a new monthly reporting requirement for redemption 
centers and reverse vending machine operators;  
4. authorizes the DRS commissioner to set an annual registration 
fee for the centers, examine their accounts and records, and take 
specified enforcement actions against them for violating certain 
requirements under the bill and existing law; and  
5. prohibits dealers and redemption centers from removing 
beverage containers from their premises or transferring them 
between premises that they control before having them removed 
by a distributor. 
The bill also requires the DRS commissioner to compensate deposit  2025SB-01115-R00-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: DD 	Page 2 	4/14/25 
 
initiators (i.e. the first distributor to collect the deposit) for deficiencies 
that result from them paying out more in refunds than they sold in a 
given quarter. It also makes minor and technical changes. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: October 1, 2025 
REDEMPTION CENTER RE QUIREMENTS  
Approval and Annual Registration 
Current law requires prospective redemption center owners to 
register with the DEEP commissioner and provide certain information, 
including the business’s address and hours, principals, sponsors and 
dealers served, and beverage containers accepted. The bill instead 
requires redemption centers to be approved by and register annually 
with DRS. It also expands the information they must provide on their 
registration forms to include:  
1. a floor plan for the redemption center that has (a) adequate and 
sanitary storage space, and (b) safe and sanitary loading, 
unloading, and vehicular access space; and  
2. records demonstrating sufficient financial resources to operate 
the redemption center. 
The bill makes a conforming change by requiring redemption centers 
to report to DRS rather than DEEP on any operational changes within 
48 hours after the change. 
The bill requires the DRS commissioner to set a reasonable annual 
registration fee for each redemption center to partially fund the agency’s 
examination and enforcement actions, as described below. 
Records Required for People Redeeming More Than 1,200 
Containers in One Day  
The bill requires redemption centers that accept more than 1,200 
containers from any one person in one day to get and record the 
following information for the person: 
1. their name,  2025SB-01115-R00-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: DD 	Page 3 	4/14/25 
 
2. the license plate number of any vehicle used to transport the 
containers to the redemption center, 
3. the collection points of the empty containers, and 
4. the number of containers brought to the redemption center. 
The redemption center must have the person certify, to the best of 
their knowledge, that the containers brought to the redemption center 
were originally sold as filled beverages in Connecticut and were not 
previously redeemed.  
Monthly Reporting Requirement 
The bill requires redemption center and reverse vending machine 
operators to submit monthly reports to the DEEP commissioner on (1) 
the number and type of containers redeemed, aggregated by town for 
each town in which they operate and (2) any other redemption 
information the commissioner finds necessary.  
DRS ENFORCEMENT 
Authority to Examine Records 
Existing law authorizes the DRS commissioner to examine deposit 
initiator accounts and records and related documents, such as receipts, 
disbursements, and other items the DRS commissioner deems 
appropriate. The bill extends the commissioner’s examination authority 
to include the accounts, records, and related documents of dealers and 
redemption centers. It also authorizes the commissioner to hire a 
sufficient number of employees to carry out the examinations and 
enforcement actions authorized by the bottle bill law (specifically those 
relating to special accounts and allowing the DEEP and DRS 
commissioners to file a complaint with the attorney general to institute 
enforcement actions).  
Enforcement Actions Against Redemption Centers  
The bill authorizes the DRS commissioner, after notice and a hearing, 
to (1) suspend or revoke a redemption center operator’s registration for 
certain violations or (2) impose a fine of between $500 and $1,000 for  2025SB-01115-R00-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: DD 	Page 4 	4/14/25 
 
each offense. Under the bill, the commissioner may impose these 
penalties if the operator: 
1. fails to get DRS approval to establish a redemption center or 
annually register with, and timely report operational changes, to 
DRS; 
2. fails to keep specified records for people redeeming more than 
1,200 containers in a day, as required under the bill; or 
3. removes beverage containers from its premises or transfers them 
between premises before having them removed by a distributor, 
as prohibited under the bill. 
Any person aggrieved by these actions may appeal according to the 
Uniform Administrative Procedure Act.  
DEFICIENCY PAYMENTS TO DEPOSIT INITIATORS 
Existing law requires deposit initiators to deposit the refund value of 
containers they sell into special interest-bearing bank accounts. Deposit 
initiators must use the funds in these special accounts to reimburse 
dealers and redemption centers for the refunds on redeemed containers. 
If a deposit initiator does not have enough money in its account in any 
quarter to pay these refunds, it must subtract the deficiency from its next 
quarterly remittance of unclaimed bottle deposits to DRS until the 
deficiency is completely subtracted. 
The bill requires the DRS commissioner to remit to deposit initiators 
a payment from the General Fund equaling the (1) amount of any 
deficiency credit the deposit initiator accumulated plus (2) a handling 
fee for each container the deposit initiator paid that exceeds the number 
of containers it sold through June 30, 2025.  
Beginning September 30, 2025, if the deposit initiator does not have 
enough money in its account in any quarter to pay the refunds, it must 
not pay this amount to the DRS commissioner. Instead, under the bill, 
the DRS commissioner must pay this amount to the deposit initiator 
from the General Fund, plus the handling fee for each container  2025SB-01115-R00-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: DD 	Page 5 	4/14/25 
 
redeemed over the number sold during the quarter.  
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Environment Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 29 Nay 4 (03/24/2025)