Connecticut 2025 2025 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01122 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/18/2025

                     
Researcher: SL 	Page 1 	3/18/25 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sSB 1122  
 
AN ACT REQUIRING ANNUAL PERFORMANCE AUDITS OF 
MEDICAID-FUNDED PROGRAMS BY THE AUDITORS OF PUBLIC 
ACCOUNTS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires the Auditors of Public Accounts to annually 
conduct performance audits of at least two Medicaid-funded programs. 
The Human Services Committee chairpersons and ranking members 
must annually, beginning by December 1, 2025, give the Auditors of 
Public Accounts a written list of at least two Medicaid-funded programs 
to audit. The auditors must select programs to audit from among this 
list annually.  
The bill requires administrators of programs being audited to give 
the auditors any information the auditors determine necessary. The 
auditors must report their findings and recommendations to the 
governor, comptroller, and Appropriations and Human Services 
committees. The bill also requires the Department of Social Services 
commissioner, within 30 days after the audit’s completion, to post a link 
to its results and recommendations on the department’s website.  
EFFECTIVE DATE: January 1, 2026, except the provision requiring 
the Human Services Committee leaders to provide a list of programs to 
be audited is effective July 1, 2025. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Human Services Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 22 Nay 0 (03/04/2025)