Connecticut 2025 2025 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01186 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/28/2025

                        
 
LCO No. 3731  	1 of 2 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 1186  
January Session, 2025 
LCO No. 3731 
 
 
Referred to Committee on PLANNING AND DEVELOPMENT  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(PD)  
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE REGIONAL PLANNING INCENTIVE 
ACCOUNT DISTRIBUTION FORMULA. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Subsection (d) of section 4-66k of the general statutes is 1 
repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2 
2025): 3 
(d) (1) For the fiscal years ending June 30, 2022, and June 30, 2023, 4 
funds from the regional planning incentive account shall be distributed 5 
to each regional council of governments [formed] created pursuant to 6 
section 4-124j, in the amount of one hundred eighty-five thousand five 7 
hundred dollars plus sixty-eight cents per capita, using population 8 
information from the most recent federal decennial census. 9 
(2) For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2024, and each fiscal year 10 
thereafter, funds from the regional planning incentive account shall be 11 
distributed to [the] each regional council of governments [formed] 12 
created pursuant to section 4-124j, in [the] an amount totaling seven 13 
million dollars. Such funds shall be distributed under a formula 14 
determined by the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management in 15 
consultation with the regional [council] councils of governments, that 16 
includes (A) a base payment amount payable to each such regional 17     
Raised Bill No.  1186 
 
 
 
LCO No. 3731   	2 of 2 
 
council, and (B) a per capita payment amount to each such regional 18 
council based upon population data for each such regional council from 19 
the most recent federal decennial census, adjusted in accordance with 20 
any change in the consumer price index for all urban consumers as 21 
published by the United States Department of Labor, Bureau of Labor 22 
Statistics, during the preceding twelve-month period, if such change 23 
reflects an increase in said index. Such formula shall be reviewed and 24 
updated [every five years after the initial adoption of such formula] 25 
annually. 26 
(3) Not later than July 1, 2021, and annually thereafter, each regional 27 
council of governments shall submit to the secretary a proposal for 28 
expenditure of the funds described in [subdivision (1) of] this 29 
subsection. Such proposal may include, but need not be limited to, a 30 
description of (A) functions, activities or services currently performed 31 
by the state or municipalities that may be provided in a more efficient, 32 
cost-effective, responsive or higher quality manner by such regional 33 
council, a regional educational service center or similar regional entity; 34 
(B) anticipated cost savings relating to the sharing of government 35 
services, including, but not limited to, joint purchasing; (C) the 36 
standardization and alignment of various regions of the state; or (D) any 37 
other initiatives that may facilitate the delivery of services to the public 38 
in a more efficient, cost-effective, responsive or higher quality manner. 39 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2025 4-66k(d) 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To index the per capita payment amount to each regional council of 
governments from the regional planning incentive account to any 
increase in the consumer price index for all urban consumers. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except 
that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not 
underlined.]