Connecticut 2025 2025 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01490 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/02/2025

                     
Researcher: MH 	Page 1 	4/2/25 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
SB 1490  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE SALE OF BATTERY	-POWERED 
SMOKE DETECTORS IN THE STATE.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill generally bans the sale, offer of sale, and distribution of 
smoke detection and warning equipment (smoke detectors) that are 
only powered by batteries, unless they are nonreplaceable, 
nonremovable, and designed to last at least 10 years. The ban does not 
apply to (1) smoke detectors that are also powered by a building’s 
electrical system, (2) fire alarm systems with smoke detection and 
warning equipment, (3) fire alarms that connect to a panel, and (4) 
devices that use a low-power radio frequency communication signal. 
The ban starts on October 1, 2025, but people may sell smoke 
detectors banned under this bill after then if they already possess or 
placed an order for them before that date.  
People in violation of the ban are subject to a maximum fine of $100 
for a first offense and $500 for any additional offense. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: Upon passage 
BACKGROUND 
The State Fire Prevention and Fire Safety Codes 
In general, the State Fire Prevention Code and Fire Safety Code 
require buildings that receive a building permit for new occupancy on 
October 1, 1985, and later to have smoke detectors that are powered by 
the building’s electrical system and a battery. Prior to that, smoke 
detectors had to be powered by the building’s electrical system (for new 
occupancy permits from October 1, 1976, to September 30, 1985). Earlier 
buildings could have smoke detectors powered by a battery only.  2025SB-01490-R000447-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: MH 	Page 2 	4/2/25 
 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Public Safety and Security Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 29 Nay 0 (03/18/2025)