District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0003 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/03/2023

                     
1 
__________________________ 1 
Councilmember Charles Allen 2 
 3 
 4 
 5 
 6 
A BILL 7 
 8 
____________ 9 
 10 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 11 
 12 
___________________________ 13 
 14 
 15 
To amend, on an emergency basis, due to congressional review, the Human Rights Act of 1977 to 16 
clarify the available remedies for the Attorney General in the prosecution of certain civil 17 
rights violations. 18 
 19 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 20 
act may be cited as the “Attorney General Civil Rights Enforcement Congressional Review 21 
Emergency Amendment Act of 2023”. 22 
 Sec. 2.  The Human Rights Act of 1977, effective December 13, 1977 (D.C. Law 2-38; 23 
D.C. Official Code § 2-1401.01 et seq.), is amended as follows:  24 
 (a) Section 102 (D.C. Official Code § 2-1401.02) is amended by adding a new paragraph 25 
(2A) to read as follows:  26 
 “(2A) “Attorney General” means the Attorney General for the District of Columbia, 27 
as established under section 435 of the Home Rule Act, effective May 28, 2011 (D.C. Law 18-28 
160A; D.C. Official Code § 1-204.35).”.   29 
 (b) A new section 316a is added to read as follows:  30 
 “Sec. 316a. Civil actions by the Attorney General.  31 
 “In a civil action initiated by the Attorney General for violations of this act, other than an 32 
action brought under section 307, the Attorney General:  33   
2 
 “(1) May obtain:  34 
 “(A) Injunctive relief, as described in section 307;  35 
 “(B) Civil penalties, up to the amounts described in section 313(a)(1)(E-i), 36 
for each action or practice in violation of this act, and, in the context of a discriminatory 37 
advertisement, for each day the advertisement was posted; and 38 
 “(C) Any other form of relief described in section 313(a)(1); and  39 
 “(2)(A) May seek subpoenas for the production of documents and materials or for 40 
the attendance and testimony of witnesses under oath, or both, which shall contain the information 41 
described in section 110a(b) of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia Clarification and 42 
Elected Term Amendment Act of 2010, effective October 22, 2015 (D.C. Law 21-36; D.C. Official 43 
Code § 1-301.88d(b) (“Act”); and   44 
 “(B) Shall follow the procedures described in section 110a(c), (d), and (e) 45 
of the Act (D.C. Official Code § 1-301.88d(c), (d), and (e); provided, that the subpoenas are not 46 
directed to a District government official or entity.”.  47 
 Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 48 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 49 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 50 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 51 
 Sec. 4. Effective date. 52 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 53 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 54 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 55   
3 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 56 
D.C. Official Code §1-204.12(a). 57