District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0017 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 01/17/2023

                      ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 
 
1 
AN ACT 
 
_______________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
______________________ 
  	To amend, on an emergency basis, Initiative Measure No. 82 - the District of Columbia Tip 
Credit Elimination Act of 2022 to postpone the date on which the 2023 increase to the 
tipped minimum wage will take effect from January 1, 2023, to Ma	y 1, 2023. 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the "Tipped Minimum Wage Increase Implementation Clarification 
Emergency Amendment Act of 2023". 
 	Sec. 2. New p aragraph (3) added to section 4(f) of the Minimum Wage Act Revision Act 
of 1992, effective March 25, 1993 (D.C. Law 9	-248; D.C. Official Code § 32-	1003(f)), by 
section 2(a) of Initiative Measure No. 82 - the District of Columbia Tip Credit Elimination Act 
of 2022, enacted on November 30, 2022 (D.C. Act 24-	700; D.C. Official Code § 32-	1003), is 
amended by striking the 	date “January 1, 2023” and inserting the date “Ma y 1, 2023” in its place. 
 
 Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 	October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-	301.47a). 
  Sec. 4. Effective date. 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 	90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section          ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 
 
2 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 
D.C. Official Code §1-	204.12(a)). 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia