District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0018 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/13/2023

                     
 
 
1 
 	_________________________________ 1 
 Councilmember Anita Bonds  2 
  3 
 4 
 5 
 6 
A BILL 7 
_______________ 8 
 9 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 10 
______________________ 11 
 12 
To amend, on a temporary basis, Initiative Measure No. 82 - the District of Columbia Tip Credit 13 
Elimination Act of 2022 to postpone the date on which the 2023 increase to the tipped 14 
minimum wage will take effect from January 1, 2023, to May 1, 2023. 15 
 16 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 17 
act may be cited as the "Tipped Minimum Wage Increase Implementation Clarification 18 
Temporary Amendment Act of 2023". 19 
Sec. 2. Section 4(f)(3) of the Minimum Wage Act Revision Act of 1992, effective March 20 
25, 1993 (D.C. Law 9-248; D.C. Official Code § 32-1003(f)(3)), is amended by striking the 21 
phrase “January 1, 2023” and inserting the phrase “May 1, 2023” in its place. 22 
Sec. 3. The Tipped Minimum Wage Increase Implementation Clarification Emergency 23 
Amendment Act of 2023, passed on emergency basis on January 17, 2022 (Bill 25-___), is 24 
repealed.  25 
Sec. 4. Applicability.  26 
This act shall apply as of the effective date of the District of Columbia Tip Credit 27 
Elimination Act of 2022, enacted on November 30, 2022 (D.C. Act 24-700; D.C. Official Code § 28 
32-1003).  29 
 Sec. 5. Fiscal impact statement. 30   
 
 
2 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal 31 
impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 32 
approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 33 
 Sec. 6. Effective date. 34 
 (a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 35 
the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review 36 
as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 37 
24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of 38 
Columbia Register. 39 
 (b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. 40