District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0085 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/07/2023

                     ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
AN ACT 
 
____________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
_________________ 
  
To amend, on an emergency basis, An Act to revise certain laws relating to the liability of hotels, 
motels, and similar establishments in the District of Columbia to their guests to authorize 
the Mayor to issue rules to establish requirements for cleaning and maintenance of hotels 
and motel rooms, with the exception of certain establishments operating on an “extended 
stay” model, and to establis	h standards for public notice of lodging establishment service 
disruptions.  
 
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “Hotel Enhanced Cleaning and Notice of Service Disruption Clarification 
Emergency Amendment Act of 2023”. 
 
 Sec. 2.  An Act to revise certain laws relating to the liability of hotels, motels, and similar 
establishments in the District of Columbia to their guests, approved December 8, 1970 (84 Stat. 
1396; D.C. Official Code § 30-	101 et seq.), is amended by adding a new section 3a to read as 
follows: 
 “Sec. 3a. Cleaning and maintenance of hotels and motels and public notice of service 
disruptions. 
 “(a)(1) The Mayor, pursuant to Title I of the District of Columbia Administrative 
Procedure Act, effective October 21, 1968 (82 Stat. 1204; D.C. Official Code § 2-	501 et seq.), 
may issue rules to establish requirements for the cleaning and maintenance of hotels, motels, and 
other lodging establishments (collectively “lodging establishments”) and to establish standards 
for public notice of actual or potential disruptions to service at, or use or enjoyment of, lodging 
establishments.  
 “(2) Notwithstanding paragraph (1) of this subsection, a lodging establishment 
shall not be required to clean guest room	s on a daily basis that conta	in a kitchen, defined as a 
cooking facility that includes a permanently affixed cooktop appliance consisting of two or more 
burners, with or without an oven, with a power supply served by either an electrical connection 
or a natural gas line, unless specifically requested by a guest. 
 “(b) Civil fines and penalties may be imposed by the Mayor pursuant to the Department 
of Consumer and Regulatory Affairs Civil Infractions Act of 1985, effective October 5, 1985 
(D.C. Law 6-42; D.C. Official Code § 2-	1801.01 et seq. ) (“Civil Infractions Act”), for infraction   ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
of the rules. The adjudication of any such infraction, fine, or penalty shall be pursuant to the 
Civil Infractions Act.”.    
 
 Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal 
impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 
approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-	301.47a).  
 
 Sec. 4. Effective date. 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 
D.C. Official Code §1-	204.12(a)). 
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia