District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0091 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/06/2023

                     
1 
___________________________ 	______________________________ 1 
Councilmember Anita Bonds  Councilmember Charles Allen 2 
 3 
 4 
 5 
A BILL 6 
 7 
_______ 8 
 9 
 10 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 11 
 12 
_______________________ 13 
 14 
 15 
To amend, on an emergency basis, due to congressional review, the Campaign Finance Reform 16 
Amendment Act of 2018 to clarify that certain sections of that act shall not apply to any 17 
inaugural or transition committee organized in 2022. 18 
 19 
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 20 
act may be cited as the “Political Committee Clarification Congressional Review Emergency 21 
Amendment Act of 2023”. 22 
 Sec. 2. Section 10(a) of the Campaign Finance Reform Amendment Act of 2018, 23 
effective March 13, 2019 (D.C. Law 22-250; 66 DCR 985), is amended to read as follows: 24 
 “(a) Sections 6(b)(4), (8), and (22), and (pp), 8, and 9 shall not apply to: 25 
 “(1) Any inaugural or transition committee organized in 2022; and 26 
 “(2) Contracts, as defined in section 101(10C)(A)(ii) of the Board of Ethics and 27 
Government Accountability Establishment and Comprehensive Ethics Reform Amendment Act 28 
of 2011, effective April 27, 2012 (D.C. Law 19-124; D.C. Official Code § 1-29 
1161.01(10C)(A)(ii)), including those contracts’ option periods or similar contract extensions or 30 
modifications, sought, entered into, or executed before November 9, 2022.”.  31 
 Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 32   
2 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 33 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 34 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 35 
 Sec. 4. Effective date. 36 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 37 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 38 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 39 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 40 
D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). 41