District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0091 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/07/2023

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
AN ACT 
 
______________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
_______________________ 
 
 
To amend, on an emergency basis, due to congressional review, the Campaign Finance Reform 
Amendment Act of 2018 	to clarify that certain sections of that act shall not apply to any 
inaugural or transition committee organized in 2022. 
 
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “	Political Committee Clarification Congressional Review Emergency 
Amendment Act of 2023	”. 
 
 Sec. 2. Section 10(a) of the Campaign Finance Reform Amendment Act of 2018, 
effective March 13, 2019 (D.C. Law 22-	250; 66 DCR 985), is amended to read as follows: 
 “(a) Sections 6(b)(4), (8), and (22), and (pp), 8, and 9 shall not apply to: 
 “(1) Any inaugural or transition committee organized in 2022; and 
 “(2) Contracts, as defined in section 101(10C)(A)(ii) of the Board of Ethics and 
Government Accountability Establishment and Comprehensive Ethics Reform Amendment Act 
of 2011, effective April 27, 2012 (D.C. Law 19-	124; D.C. Official Code § 1-
1161.01(10C)(A)(ii)), including those contracts’ option periods or similar contract extensions or 
modifications, sought, entered into, or executed before November 9, 2022.	”. 
 
 Sec. 3. Applicability. 
 This act shall apply as of December 8, 2022. 
 
 Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-	301.47a). 
 
 Sec. 5. Effective date. 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section  
 
    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 
D.C. Official Code § 1-	204.12(a)). 
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia