District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0092 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/06/2023

                     
1 
        	______________________________ 1 
        C	ouncilmember Charles Allen 2 
    3 
 4 
 5 
A BILL 6 
 7 
_______ 8 
 9 
 10 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 11 
 12 
_______________________ 13 
 14 
 15 
To amend, on an emergency basis, the District Department of the Environment Establishment 16 
Act of 2005 to provide that money in the Clean Rivers Impervious Area Charge 17 
Assistance Fund may be provided to eligible residential customers of the District of 18 
Columbia Water and Sewer Authority for payment of amounts due to the District of 19 
Columbia Water and Sewer Authority; and to amend the Sustainable Solid Waste 20 
Management Amendment Act of 2014 to establish a December 31, 2022, deadline for the 21 
first submission of proposed stewardship plans to the Department of Energy and  22 
Environment, and to clarify that manufacturers must accept covered electronic equipment 23 
for recycling and reuse where a customer purchases the same type of electronic 24 
equipment from the manufacturer. 25 
 26 
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 27 
act may be cited as the “CRIAC Assistance Fund Congressional Review Emergency Amendment 28 
Act of 2023”. 29 
 Sec. 2. Section 113a(c) of the District Department of the Environment Establishment Act 30 
29 of 2005, effective September 11, 2019 (D.C. Law 23-16; D.C. Official Code § 8-151.13a(c)), 31 
is 30 amended as follows: 32 
 (a) The existing language is designated as paragraph (1).  33 
 (b) A new paragraph (2) is added to read as follows: 34   
2 
 “(2)(A) In Fiscal Year 2023, money in the fund may be provided to eligible 34 35 
residential customers of the District of Columbia Water and Sewer Authority (“DC Water”) for 36 
the payment of amounts due to DC Water.  37 
 “(B) A residential customer shall be deemed eligible for reli ef under this 38 
paragraph where:  39 
   “(i) The residential customer is a resident of the District of Columbia;  40 
   “(ii) The residential customer’s annual household income is less than or 41 
equal to 100% of the area median income; and  42 
   “(iii) Continued nonpayment of amounts due to DC Water will result in 43 
the discontinuance of water service to the residential customer during Fiscal Year 2023.  44 
 “(C) Amounts made available from the Fund for relief provided under this 45 
paragraph shall not exceed the fund balance as of September 30, 2022.  46 
 “(D) The Mayor may issue a grant, reprogramming, or other transfer of funds to 47 
DC Water to implement this paragraph.  48 
 “(E) On or before July 1, 2022, the Department of Energy and Environment shall 49 
provide data to the Council on, for Fiscal Year 2023, the number of residential customers 50 
provided funding and the total dollar amount of funding provided to residential customers 51 
pursuant to this paragraph.”.   52 
 Sec. 3. The Sustainable Solid Waste Management Amendment Act of 2014, effective 53 
February 26, 2015 (D.C. Law 20-154; D.C. Official Code § 8-1041 et seq.), is amended as 54 
follows:  55 
 (a) The lead in language of section 117(b) (D.C. Official Code § 8-1041.03(b)) is 56 
amended to read as follows: 57   
3 
 “(b) By December 31, 2022, October 1, 2023, and annually thereafter, a manufacturer or 58 
its partnership or representative organization as provided in subsection (c) of this section shall 59 
submit an application for registration with the Mayor that shall include:”. 60 
 (b) Section 119(d) (D.C. Official Code § 8-1041.05(d)) is amended to read as follows: 61 
 “(d) Beginning January 1, 2017, a manufacturer shall accept for recycling or reuse, on a 62 
one-to-one basis with the purchase in the District of the same type of covered electronic 63 
equipment, any brand of covered electronic equipment that is offered for return to the 64 
manufacturer by a person in the District.” 65 
 Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 66 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 67 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 68 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 69 
 Sec. 4. Effective date. 70 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 71 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 72 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 73 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 74 
D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). 75