1 ______________________________ 1 C ouncilmember Charles Allen 2 3 4 5 A BILL 6 7 _______ 8 9 10 IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 11 12 _______________________ 13 14 15 To amend, on an emergency basis, the District Department of the Environment Establishment 16 Act of 2005 to provide that money in the Clean Rivers Impervious Area Charge 17 Assistance Fund may be provided to eligible residential customers of the District of 18 Columbia Water and Sewer Authority for payment of amounts due to the District of 19 Columbia Water and Sewer Authority; and to amend the Sustainable Solid Waste 20 Management Amendment Act of 2014 to establish a December 31, 2022, deadline for the 21 first submission of proposed stewardship plans to the Department of Energy and 22 Environment, and to clarify that manufacturers must accept covered electronic equipment 23 for recycling and reuse where a customer purchases the same type of electronic 24 equipment from the manufacturer. 25 26 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 27 act may be cited as the “CRIAC Assistance Fund Congressional Review Emergency Amendment 28 Act of 2023”. 29 Sec. 2. Section 113a(c) of the District Department of the Environment Establishment Act 30 29 of 2005, effective September 11, 2019 (D.C. Law 23-16; D.C. Official Code § 8-151.13a(c)), 31 is 30 amended as follows: 32 (a) The existing language is designated as paragraph (1). 33 (b) A new paragraph (2) is added to read as follows: 34 2 “(2)(A) In Fiscal Year 2023, money in the fund may be provided to eligible 34 35 residential customers of the District of Columbia Water and Sewer Authority (“DC Water”) for 36 the payment of amounts due to DC Water. 37 “(B) A residential customer shall be deemed eligible for reli ef under this 38 paragraph where: 39 “(i) The residential customer is a resident of the District of Columbia; 40 “(ii) The residential customer’s annual household income is less than or 41 equal to 100% of the area median income; and 42 “(iii) Continued nonpayment of amounts due to DC Water will result in 43 the discontinuance of water service to the residential customer during Fiscal Year 2023. 44 “(C) Amounts made available from the Fund for relief provided under this 45 paragraph shall not exceed the fund balance as of September 30, 2022. 46 “(D) The Mayor may issue a grant, reprogramming, or other transfer of funds to 47 DC Water to implement this paragraph. 48 “(E) On or before July 1, 2022, the Department of Energy and Environment shall 49 provide data to the Council on, for Fiscal Year 2023, the number of residential customers 50 provided funding and the total dollar amount of funding provided to residential customers 51 pursuant to this paragraph.”. 52 Sec. 3. The Sustainable Solid Waste Management Amendment Act of 2014, effective 53 February 26, 2015 (D.C. Law 20-154; D.C. Official Code § 8-1041 et seq.), is amended as 54 follows: 55 (a) The lead in language of section 117(b) (D.C. Official Code § 8-1041.03(b)) is 56 amended to read as follows: 57 3 “(b) By December 31, 2022, October 1, 2023, and annually thereafter, a manufacturer or 58 its partnership or representative organization as provided in subsection (c) of this section shall 59 submit an application for registration with the Mayor that shall include:”. 60 (b) Section 119(d) (D.C. Official Code § 8-1041.05(d)) is amended to read as follows: 61 “(d) Beginning January 1, 2017, a manufacturer shall accept for recycling or reuse, on a 62 one-to-one basis with the purchase in the District of the same type of covered electronic 63 equipment, any brand of covered electronic equipment that is offered for return to the 64 manufacturer by a person in the District.” 65 Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 66 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 67 statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 68 October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 69 Sec. 4. Effective date. 70 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 71 Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 72 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 73 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 74 D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). 75