District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0092 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/07/2023

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
AN ACT 
 
_______________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
_______________________ 
 
 
To amend, on an emergency basis, due to congressional review, the District Department of the 
Environment Establishment Act of 2005 to provide that money in the Clean Rivers 
Impervious Area Charge Assistance Fund may be provided to eligible residential 
customers of the District of Columbia Water and Sewer Authority for payment of 
amounts due to the District of Columbia Water and Sewer Authority; and to amend the 
Sustainable Solid Waste Management Amendment Act of 2014 to establish a December 
31, 2022, deadline for the first submission of proposed stewardship plans to the 
Department of Energy and  Environment, and to clarify that manufacturers must accept 
covered electronic equipment for recycling and reuse where a customer purchases the 
same type of electronic equipment from the manufacturer. 
 
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “	CRIAC Assistance Fund Congressional Review Emergency Amendment 
Act of 2023” . 
 
 Sec. 2. Section 113a(c) of the District Department of the Environment Establishment Act 
of 2005, effective September 11, 2019 (D.C. Law 23-	16; D.C. Official Code § 8	-151.13a(c)), is 
amended as follows: 
 (a) The existing language is designated as paragraph (1).  
 (b) A new paragraph (2) is added to read as follows: 
 “(2)(A) In Fiscal Year 2023, money in the fund may be provided to eligible 
residential customers of the District of Columbia Water and Sewer Authority (“DC Water”) for 
the payment of amounts due to DC Water.  
 “(B) A residential customer shall be deemed eligible for relief under this 
paragraph where:  
 “(i) The residential customer is a resident of the District of Columbia;  
 “(ii) The residential customer’s annual household income is less than or 
equal to 100% of the area median income; and  
 “(iii) Continued nonpayment of amounts due to DC Water will result in 
the discontinuance of water service to the residential customer during Fiscal Year 2023.  
 “(C) Amounts made available from the Fund for relief provided under this 
paragraph shall not exceed the fund balance as of September 30, 2022.     	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 “(D) The Mayor may issue a grant, reprogramming, or other transfer of funds to 
DC Water to implement this paragraph.  
 “(E) On or before July 1, 2022, the Department of Energy and Environment shall 
provide data to the Council on, for Fiscal Year 2023, the number of residential customers 
provided funding and the total dollar amount of funding provided to residential customers 
pursuant to this paragraph.”.   
 
 Sec. 3. The Sustainable Solid Waste Management Amendment Act of 2014, effective 
February 26, 2015 (D.C. Law 20-	154; D.C. Official Code § 8-	1041 et seq.), is amended as 
follows:  
 (a) The lead in language of section 117(b) (D.C. Official Code § 8-	1041.03(b)) is 
amended to read as follows: 
 “(b) By December 31, 2022, October 1, 2023, and annually thereafter, a manufacturer or 
its partnership or representative organization as provided in subsection (c) of this section shall 
submit an application for registration with the Mayor that shall include:”. 
 (b) Section 119(d) (D.C. Official Code § 8-	1041.05(d)) is amended to read as follows: 
 “(d) Beginning January 1, 2017, a manufacturer shall accept for recycling or reuse, on a 
one-to-one basis with the purchase in the District of the same type of covered electronic 
equipment, any brand of covered electronic equipment that is offered for return to the 
manufacturer by a person in the District.”. 
 
 Sec. 3.  Applicability. 
 This act shall apply as of November 22, 2022. 
 
 Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-	301.47a). 
 
 Sec. 5. Effective date. 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section  
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
3 
 
 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 
D.C. Official Code § 1-	204.12(a)). 
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia