District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0121 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/07/2023

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
AN ACT 
 
___________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
_______________ 
 
To amend, on an emergency basis, due to congressional review, 	the District of Columbia 
Government Comprehensive Merit Personnel Act of 1978 to provide paid leave for a 
District government employee when the employee suffers the death of the employee’s 
minor child or a stillbirth. 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “District Government Parental Bereavement Leave Congressional 
Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2023”. 
 
 Sec. 2. Section 1203 of the District of Columbia Government Comprehensive Merit 
Personnel Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-	139; D.C. Official Code § 1-
612.03), is amended by adding a new subsection (n-	1) to read as follows: 
 “(n-1)(1) In addition to the leave authorized by subsection (n) of this section, an 
employee shall be entitled to 10 days of bereavement leave without loss of pay, leave, or service 
credit when the employee suffers a stillbirth or the employee suffers the death of the employee’s 
child under the age of 21 years.  
 “(2) Leave authorized by paragraph (1) of this subsection must be exercised 
within 60 days after the death of the employee’s child or after the employee suffers a stillbirth.  
 “(3) Leave authorized by paragraph (1) of this subsection shall not count toward 
the unpaid medical and family leave entitlements in the District of Columbia Family and Medical 
Leave Act of 1990, effective Oc tober 3, 1990 (D.C. Law 8-	181; D.C. Official Code § 32-	501 et 
seq.), and shall be in addition to paid medical or family leave otherwise available to the 
employee under this title.  
 “(4) For the purposes of this subsection, the term:  
 “(A) “Child” means:  
“(i) The biological, adoptive, or step-	child of the employee or the 
employee’s spouse; or  
“(ii) A person for whom the employee stands in loco parentis.  
 “(B) “Stillbirth” means the death of a fetus at 20 weeks’ gestation or later 
for the following employees: 
 “(i) An employee who was pregnant with the fetus;    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 “(ii) An employee who is the spouse or domestic partner of the 
individual who was pregnant with the fetus; or 
 “(iii) An employee who intended to assume parental 
responsibilities for the fetus had the fetus been born alive.”.  
 
 Sec. 3. Applicability. 
 This act shall apply as of November 19, 2022. 
 
Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-	301.47a). 
 
 Sec. 5. Effective date. 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 
D.C. Official Code § 1-	204.12(a)). 
 
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia