District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0148 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/02/2023

                     ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
1 
 
AN ACT 
 
___________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
______________________ 
 
 
To amend, on a temporary basis, An Act to provide for regulation of certain insurance rates in 
the District of Columbia, and for other purposes, to change the private passenger or non-
commercial motor vehicle and homeowner insurance rate filing standard from file and 
use to prior approval with a 90-day review period, to require notice and opportunity for a 
hearing before a rate filing is determined to be excessive or unfairly discriminatory, and, 
beginning on September 1, 2023, to require an insurer to provide an insured written 
notice before renewal of a policy.  
 
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “Motor Vehicle and Homeowner Insurance Prior Approval Rate Filing 
Temporary Amendment Act of 2023”. 
 
Sec. 2.  An Act To provide for regulation of certain insurance rates in the District of 
Columbia, and for other purposes, approved May 20, 1948 (62 Stat. 243; D.C. Official Code §§ 
31-2701 et seq.), is amended follows:  
 (a) Section 3(f)(2) (D.C. Official Code § 31-2703(f)(2)) is amended to read as follows: 
 “(2)(A)(i) Every final rate or premium charge proposed to be used by any private 
passenger or non-commercial motor vehicle insurer or homeowner insurer shall be filed with the 
Commissioner and shall be adequate, not excessive, and not unfairly discriminatory. Before a 
private passenger or non-commercial motor vehicle or homeowner rate filing shall become 
effective, the Commissioner shall have the authority to determine within 90 days after the filing 
date that a rate is excessive if the rate is unreasonably high for the insurance provided and is not 
actuarially justified based on commonly accepted actuarial principles.  
  “(ii) In determining whether a rate complies with the standards under this 
subsection, due consideration shall be given to past and prospective loss experience within and 
outside the District, a reasonable margin for underwriting profit and contingencies, dividends, 
savings, or unabsorbed premium deposits allowed or returned by insurers to their policyholders 
or members or subscribers, past and prospective expenses, both nationwide and in the District, 
and investment income earned or realized by insurers both from their unearned premiums and 
from their loss reserve funds. 
“(B)(i) If the Commissioner does not make a determination on a proposed 
rate within the 90-day period, the rate shall be deemed approved.     ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
2 
 
  “(ii) If the Commissioner determines, within the 90-day review 
period, that a private passenger or non-commercial motor vehicle or homeowner rate may be 
excessive or unfairly discriminatory, the Commissioner shall provide the insurer with notice of 
the determination and the reasons for the determination and an opportunity for a hearing.  
   “(iii) A hearing must be requested by the insurer within 15 days 
after the notice is provided to the insurer by the Commissioner.  A hearing shall be held by the 
Commissioner within 60 days after a written request is timely received from the insurer and the 
Commissioner shall issue a final order within 30 days after the close of the hearing record.   
  “(iv) The cost of the hearing shall be borne by the insurer 
requesting the rate increase.  
  “(C) Beginning on September 1, 2023, or such later date as determined by 
the Commissioner, the private passenger or non-commercial motor vehicle insurer or homeowner 
insurer shall provide the insured written notice at least 45 days, and not more than 90 days, 
before renewal of the policy. If the insurer fails to provide written notice at least 45 days before 
the end of the current term of the policyholder’s policy, the insurer shall wait until the end of the 
subsequent term of the policyholder’s policy to implement the rate or premium increase.”. 
 
 (b) Section 4(c)(2)(A)(ii) (D.C. Official Code § 31-2704(c)(2)(A)(ii)) is amended to read 
as follows: 
  “(ii) The order is made after the prescribed investigation and hearing and 
within 30 days after the filing of rates affected, except as otherwise permitted by § 3(f)(2) of the 
act.” 
 
      Sec. 3.  Fiscal impact statement. 
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal 
impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 
approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 
 
Sec. 4. Effective date. 
(a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto 
by the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and a 30-day period of Congressional 
review as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved  
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
   ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
3 
 
December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Code § 1-206(c)(1)), and publication in the District of 
Columbia Register. 
 (b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. 
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia