District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0159 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/06/2023

                    _______________________________ 1 
Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr. 2 
 3 
 4 
A BILL 5 
________ 6 
 7 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 8 
______________________ 9 
 10 
To amend on an emergency basis the Rental Housing Act of 1985 to enact a moratorium on 11 
applications for, and the Mayor’s issuance  	of, certificates of assurance associated with 12 
District rent stabilization laws	. 13 
 14 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this act may 15 
be cited as the “Certificate of Assurance Moratorium Extension Emergency Amendment Act of 16 
2023”. 17 
Sec. 2. The Rental Housing Act of 1985, effective July 17, 1985 (D.C. Law 6-	10; D.C. 18 
Official Code § 42-	3501.01 et seq .)), is amended by adding a new section 221a to read as 19 
follows:  20 
 “Sec. 221a. Certificate of assurance moratorium. 21 
 “Notwithstanding the requirements of section 221, beginning on November 4, 2020, no 22 
owner of a housing accommodation shall request a certificate of assurance, and the Mayor shall 23 
not issue a certificate of assurance for any request received	.”.  24 
Sec. 3. Applicability. 25 
This act shall apply as of November 4, 2020. 26 
Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 27 
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 28 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 29 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-	301.47a). 30  2 
 
Sec. 5. Effective date. 31 
This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 32 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 33 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 34 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 35 
D.C. Official Code § 1-	204.12(a)). 36