District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0226 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 11/07/2023

                      	ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	1 
A BILL 1 
 2 
25-226 3 
 4 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 5 
 6 
_________________ 7 
 8 
 9 
To amend the Student Access to Treatment Act of 2007 to require the Department of Health to 10 
develop and implement an Undesignated Emergency Medications Action Plan that would 11 
authorize public schools to possess and administer undesignated emergency medications 12 
determined by the Department of Health, to require the Department of Health to oversee 13 
the procurement and distribution of undesignated medications and maintain records 14 
regarding the types and quantities of undesignated medications to ensure an adequate 15 
supply, to require at least two employees or agents of each public school to be certified in 16 
the use of undesignated emergency medications, and to require the Office of the State 17 
Superintendent of Education to oversee school compliance with the employee 18 
certification requirement and provide schools with resources for the storage of 19 
undesignated medication and dissemination of public school employee contact 20 
information.  21 
 22 
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 23 
act may be cited as the “Access to Emergency Medications Amendment Act of 2023.” 24 
 Sec. 2. The Student Access to Treatment Act of 2007, effective February 2, 2008 (D.C. 25 
Law 17-107; D.C. Official Code § 38-651.01 et seq.), is amended as follows: 26 
 (a) Section 2 (D.C. Official Code § 38-651.01) is amended as follows: 27 
(1) A new paragraph (5B) is added to read as follows: 28 
 “(5B) “Undesignated emergency medication” means:  29 
“(A) Albuterol; 30 
  “(B) Glucagon; and 31    	ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	2 
“(C) Any other medication designated by the Department of Health by rule 32 
pursuant to section 13 that would be administered in emergency circumstances to a student 33 
without a prescription for that medication on file with the school.”. 34 
 (2) A new paragraph (7A) is added to read as follows: 35 
 “(7A) “UEMA plan” means the undesignated emergency medications action plan 36 
established pursuant to section 7.”. 37 
 (b) Section 7 (D.C. Official Code § 38-651.06) is amended to read as follows: 38 
 “Sec. 7. Student access to emergency medications. 39 
 “(a) By February 1, 2024, the Department of Health (“Department”) shall establish a 40 
UEMA plan that authorizes a public school to possess and administer undesignated emergency 41 
medications to students without prescriptions for those medications. 42 
 “(b) By June 1, 2024, the Department shall obtain a standing order signed by at least one 43 
physician, physician assistant, or advanced practice nurse licensed in the District to permit public 44 
schools to use undesignated emergency medications.  45 
 “(c) Under the UEMA plan, the Department shall: 46 
 “(1) Ensure that undesignated emergency medications are procured and 47 
distributed to public schools for use in emergency circumstances; 48 
 “(2) Ensure the removal and replacement of expired undesignated agency 49 
medication in a timely manner; 50    	ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	3 
 “(3) Monitor the supply of undesignated emergency medications and ensure 51 
sufficient supply is provided to public schools;  52 
 “(4) Maintain records of the types and quantities of undesignated emergency 53 
medications at each public school; 54 
 “(5) Maintain records regarding the procurement, distribution, and disposition of 55 
undesignated medications for 3 years; and 56 
 “(6) Establish written protocols for schools to notify a student’s responsible 57 
person and health suite personnel after the school’s certified staff or agent administers an 58 
undesignated emergency medication. 59 
 “(d)(1) Beginning July 1, 2024, each public school shall: 60 
 “(A) Designate at least 2 employees or agents of the school to be certified 61 
in the use of undesignated emergency medications who are available to administer medications 62 
during all hours of the school day; 63 
 “(B) Store undesignated emergency medications in a secure but easily 64 
accessible location in accordance with the manufacturer’s instructions; and 65 
 “(C) Communicate the contact information of the school’s certified 66 
employees or agents to all staff and personnel at the school. 67 
 “(2) For the purposes of this subsection, the term “certified” means an individual 68 
who has obtained a certificate of completion of the Department’s medication training program 69 
pursuant to section 5. 70    	ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	4 
 “(e) OSSE shall: 71 
 “(1) Require written proof of compliance with subsection (d) of this section from 72 
each public school on an annual basis; 73 
 “(2) Require any public school not in compliance to submit a plan outlining the 74 
steps the school will take to address the noncompliance;  75 
 “(3) Provide public schools with resources to implement the requirements of 76 
subsection (d) of this section; and 77 
 “(4) Maintain records regarding each public school’s compliance with subsection 78 
(d) of this section for 3 years.  79 
 “(f)(1) An employee or agent of a public school who is certified pursuant to this section 80 
may administer an undesignated emergency medication to a student whom the employee or agent 81 
believes in good faith to immediately require the medication. 82 
 “(2)(A) Undesignated emergency medications may be used on public school 83 
property, including the school building, playground, and school bus, as well as during field trips 84 
or sanctioned excursions away from public school property.  85 
 “(B) The certified employee or agent of the public school may carry an 86 
appropriate supply of the public school’s undesignated emergency medications on field trips or 87 
excursions; provided, that there remains a sufficient supply of undesignated emergency 88 
medication in the school building. 89    	ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	5 
 “(3) Within one business day of administering an undesignated emergency 90 
medication to a student, the public school shall notify the Department, who shall in turn: 91 
 “(A) Notify OSSE; 92 
 “(B) Notify the physician, physician assistant, or advance practice nurse 93 
who provided the standing order for the undesignated emergency medication; and 94 
 “(C) Provide guidance to the school on how to notify the student’s 95 
responsible person and health suite personnel that undesignated emergency medication was 96 
administered. 97 
 “(g) An employee or agent of a public school who is certified pursuant to this section 98 
may also administer medication for which they are trained to a student to whom it is prescribed, 99 
who the employee or agent believes in good faith requires the immediate use of the medication. 100 
 “(h) DC Health shall develop a procedure by which the responsible person may request 101 
that the student not receive treatment in emergency circumstances.”.  102 
 (c) Section 13 (D.C. Official Code § 38-651.12) is amended by adding a new subsection 103 
(e) to read as follows: 104 
“(e) The Department of Health shall issue rules to implement the provisions of section 7, 105 
including the creation of a list designating specific medications that would be administered in 106 
emergency circumstances.”.  107 
 Sec. 3. Applicability. 108    	ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	6 
(a) Amended section 7(b) through (h) within section 2(b) shall apply upon the date of 109 
inclusion of its fiscal effect in an approved budget and financial plan. 110 
(b) The Chief Financial Officer shall certify the date of the inclusion of the fiscal effect in 111 
an approved budget and financial plan, and provide notice to the Budget Director of the Council 112 
of the certification. 113 
(c)(1) The Budget Director shall cause the notice of the certification to be published in 114 
the District of Columbia Register. 115 
(2) The date of publication of the notice of the certification shall not affect the 116 
applicability of this act. 117 
Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 118 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement in the committee report as the fiscal 119 
impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 120 
approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 121 
 Sec. 5. Effective date. 122 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 123 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review as 124 
provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 125 
24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of 126 
Columbia Register.  127