District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0226 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 12/05/2023

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	1 
AN ACT 
 
_____________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
__________________________ 
 
 
To amend the Student Access to Treatment Act of 2007 to require the D	epartment of Health to 
develop and implement an Undesignated Emergency Medications Action Plan that would 
authorize public schools to possess and administer undesignated emergency medications 
determined by the Department of Health, to require the Department of Health to oversee 
the procurement and distribution of undesignated emergency medications and maintain 
records regarding the type s and quantities of undesignated emergency medication	s to 
ensure an adequate supply, to require at least 2 employees or agents of each public school 
to be certified in the use of undesignated emergency medications, and to require the 
Office of the State Superintendent of Education to oversee school compliance with the 
employee certification requirement and provide schools with resources for the storage of 
undesignated emergency medications and dissemination of public school employee 
contact information.  
 
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “	Access to Emergency Medications Amendment Act of 2023.” 
 
 Sec. 2. The Student Access to Treatment Act of 2007, effective February 2, 2008 (D.C. 
Law 17- 107; D.C. Official Code § 38-	651.01 et seq. ), is amended as follows: 
 (a) Section 2 (D.C. Official Code § 38-	651.01) is amended as follows: 
(1) A new paragraph (5B) is added to read as follows: 
 “(5B) “Undesignated e mergency m edications” means:  
“(A) Albuterol ; 
  “(B) Glucagon; and 
“(C) Any other medication designat	ed by the Department of Health by rule 
pursuant to section 13 that would be administered in emergency circumstances 	to a student 
without a prescription for that medication on file with the school .”. 
 (2) A new paragraph (7A) is added to read as follows: 
 “(7A) “UEMA plan” means the undesignated emergency medications action plan 
established pursuant to section 7.”. 
 (b) Section 7 (D.C. Official Code § 38-	651.06) is amended to read as follows: 
 “Sec. 7. Student a ccess to undesignated e	mergency m edications.    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	2 
 “(a) By February 1, 2024, the Department of Health (“Department”) shall establish a 
UEMA plan that authorizes a public school to possess and administer undesignated emergency 
medications to students without prescriptions for those medications. 
 “(b) By June 1, 2024, the Department shall obtain a standing order signed by at least one 
physician, physician assistant, or advanced practice nurse licensed in the District to permit public 
schools to use undesignated emergency medications	.  
 “(c) Under the UEMA plan, the Department shall: 
 “(1) Ensure that undesignated emergency medications are procured and 
distributed to public schools for use in emergency circumstances; 
 “(2) Ensure the removal and replacement of expired undesignated emergency 
medications in a timely manner; 
 “(3) Monitor the supply of undesignated emergency medications and ensure 
sufficient supply is provided to public s	chools;  
 “(4) Maintain records of the type s and quantities of undesignated emergency 
medications at each public school; 
 “(5) Maintain records regarding the procurement, distribution, and disposition of 
undesignated emergency medications for 3 years ; and 
 “(6) Establish written protocols for schools to notify a student’s responsible 
person and health suite personnel after the school	’s certified staff or agent administers an 
undesignated emergency medication. 
 “(d)(1) Beginning July 1, 2024, each public school shall: 
 “(A) Designate at least 2 	employees or agents of the school to be certified 
in the use of undesignated emergency medications who are available to administer medications 
during all hours of the school day; 
 “(B) Store undesignated emergency medications in a secure but easily 
accessible location in accordance with the manufacturer’s instructions; and 
 “(C) Communicate the contact information of the school’s certified 
employees or agents to all staff and personnel at the school. 
 “(2) For the purposes of this subsection, the term “	certified” means an individual 
who has obtained a certificate of completion of the Department’s medication administration 
training program established by section 5	. 
 “(e) OSSE shall: 
 “(1) Require written proof of compliance with subsection (d) of this section from 
each public school on an annual basis; 
 “(2) Require any public school not in compliance to submit a plan outlining the 
steps the school shall take to address the noncompliance	;  
 “(3) Provide public schools with resources to implement the requirements of 
subsection (d) of this section; an d 
 “(4) Maintain records regarding each public school	’s compliance with subsection 
(d) of this section for 3 years.      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	3 
 “(f)(1) An employee or agent of a public school who is certified pursuant to this section 
may administer an undesignated emergency medication to a student whom the employee or agent 
believes in good faith to immediately require the 	medication. 
 “(2)(A) Undesignated emergency medications may be used on public school 
property, including the school building, playground, and school bus, as well as during field trips 
or sanctioned excursions away from public school property.  
 “(B) The certified employee or agent of the public school may carry an 
appropriate supply of the public school’s undesignated emergency medications on field trips or 
excursions; provided, that there remains a sufficient supply of the undesignated emergency 
medication in the school building. 
 “(3) Within one business day of administ ering an undesignated emergency 
medication to a student, the public school shall notify the Department, who shall in turn: 
 “(A) Notify OSSE; 
 “(B) Notify the physician, physician assistant, or advance practice nurse 
who provided the standing order for the undesignated emergency medication	; and 
 “(C) Provide guidance to the school on how to notify the student’s 
responsible person and health suite personnel that undesignated emergency medication was 
administered. 
 “(g) An employee or agent of a public school who is certified pursuant to this section 
may also administer medication for which the y are trained to a student to whom it is prescribed, 
who the employee or agent believes in good faith requires the immediate use of the medication. 
 “(h) The Department shall develop a procedure by which the responsible person may 
request that the student not receive treatment in emergency circumstances.”.  
 (c) Section 13 (D.C. Of	ficial Code § 38-651.12) is amended by adding a new subsection 
(e) to read as follows: 
“(e) The Department of Health shall issue rules to implement the provisions of section 7, 
including the creat ion of a list designating specific medications that would be administered in 
emergency circumstances.”.  
 
 Sec. 3. Applicability. 
(a) Amendatory s ection 7(b) through (h) within section 2(b) shall apply upon the date of 
inclusion of its fiscal effect in an approved budget and financial plan. 
(b) The Chief Financial Officer shall certify the date of the inclusion of the fiscal effect in 
an approved budget and financial plan, and provide notice to the Budget Director of the Council 
of the certification. 
(c)(1) The Budget Director shall cause the notice of the certification to be published in 
the District of Columbia Register. 
(2) The date of publication of the notice of the certification shall not affect the 
applicability of this act. 
    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 	4 
Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement in the committee report as the fiscal 
impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 
approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-	301.47a). 
 
 Sec. 5. Effective date. 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-	day period of congressional review as 
provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 
24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-	206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of 
Columbia Register.  
 
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia