March 29, 2023 Dear Chairman Mendelson: I urge you to take prompt and favorable action regarding this legislation. :rMuri ;1 Bo The legislation will approve multiyear Contract No. CW101347 with Axon Enterprise, Inc. to provide body-worn camera systems and accessories. The proposed contract is in the not-to- exceed amount of $3,280,680 for the period of September 28, 2022 through September 27, 2026. As always, I am available to discuss any questions you may have regarding this contract. In order to facilitate a response to any questions, please have your staff contact Marc Scott, Chief Operating Officer at the Office of Contracting and Procurement at (202) 724-8759. The Honorable Phil Mendelson Chairman Council of the District of Columbia John A. Wilson Building 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504 Washington, DC 20004 Enclosed for consideration and approval by the Council of the District of Columbia is proposed emergency legislation, the “Contract No. CW101347 with Axon Enterprise, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2023”, along with the accompanying emergency declaration resolution. MURIEL BOWSER MAYOR Sincltely, A BILL IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this act may be cited as the “Contract No. CW101347 with Axon Enterprise, Inc. Approval and19 20 21 December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 803; D.C. Official Code § 1-204.51), and notwithstanding the22 requirements of section 202(a) of the Procurement Practices Reform Act of 2010, effective Apiil 23 8, 2011 (D.C. Law 18-371; D.C. Official Code § 2-352.02(a)), the Council approves Contract 24 No. CW101347 to provide body-worn camera systems and accessories in the not-to exceed25 amount of $3,280,680 for goods and services received and to be received under the contract. 26 Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement.27 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal 28 29 30 See. 4. Effective date.31 1 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 To approve, on an emergency basis, multiyear Contract No. CW101347 with Axon Enterprise, Inc. to provide body-worn camera systems and accessories. Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2023.” Sec. 2. Pursuant to section 451 of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). Chairman Phil Mendelson at the request of the Mayor This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the32 Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than33 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section34 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788;35 D.C. Official Code § l-204.12(a)).36 2