District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0298 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/05/2024

                     ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 	1 
A BILL 1 
 2 
25-298 3 
 4 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 5 
 6 
_________________________ 7 
 8 
 9 
To require the Office of Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual, Transgender, and Questioning Affairs to 10 
research and produce a report documenting the Black LGBTQIA+ history of the District. 11 
 12 
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 13 
act may be cited as the “Black LGBTQIA+ History Preservation Establishment Act of 2024”. 14 
 Sec. 2. Black LGBTQIA+ history report.  15 
 (a) The Office of Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual, Transgender, and Questioning Affairs 16 
(“Office”) shall research and produce a report on Black LGBTQIA+ history in the District. The 17 
report shall include:  18 
 (1) The history of the Black Pride Movement in the District, and the notable 19 
people, places, and events that contribute to the rich history of the national and global queer 20 
culture;  21 
  (2) An analysis of the unique history of Black Trans people in the District and the 22 
contributions they have made to culture, activism, education, and other important spheres; 23 
 (3) The historical context of the AIDS Crisis, its effects on the Black LGBTQIA+ 24 
community in the District, and how policy choices imact the community to the present day; 25 
 (4) Curriculum recommendations for teaching Black LGBTQIA+ history in 26   ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 	2 
public schools in line with the Social Studies Standards for District of Columbia Students; and  27 
 (5) Recommendations on how to promote the report to the public. 28 
 (b)  In developing the report, the Office shall consult individuals with lived experience or 29 
expertise on the topics covered and may provide compensation to those individuals for their time 30 
and contributions.  31 
 (c) The Office shall gather input for the report before final publication as follows:  32 
 (1) Hold a minimum of 2 public meetings; and 33 
 (2) At least 90 days prior to completing the report, the Office shall publish a draft 34 
report and provide a 30-day public comment period. 35 
 (d) The Office shall submit the final report to the Mayor, the Council, the District of 36 
Columbia Archives, and the DC Public Library’s People’s Archives by May 1, 2025. 37 
 Sec. 3. Advisory committee. 38 
 (a) There is established an Advisory Committee to provide guidance and feedback on the 39 
development of the report required by section 2 of this act. The Advisory Committee shall 40 
consist of 6 members to be appointed as follows:  41 
 (1) One member from a Historically Black College or University located in the 42 
District, with expertise in Black LGBTQIA+ history, recommended by the Office; 43 
(2) Two members, with expertise in Black LGBTQIA+ history, appointed by the  44 
Chairman of the Council;  45 
 (3) Two members, with expertise in Black LGBTQIA+ history, appointed by the 46 
Mayor; and 47   ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 	3 
 (4) One member who is the Executive Director of from the Commission on the 48 
Arts and Humanities, or his or her designee, with expertise in Black LGBTQIA+ history, 49 
recommended by the Executive Director of the Commission on Arts and Humanities. 50 
 (b) The Advisory Committee shall meet no more than once a month, for up to 12 months 51 
to conduct its business and shall remain in effect until the completion of the report required by 52 
section 2 of this act.  53 
 (c) The Advisory Committee shall submit a final commentary summarizing its activities,  54 
recommendations, and any dissenting opinions to the Office, which shall be incorporated into the 55 
final report required by section 2 of this act. 56 
 Sec. 4. Advisory committee compensation. 57 
 (a) Section 1108(c-2) of the District of Columbia Government  58 
Comprehensive Merit Personnel Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-139; D.C. 59 
Official Code §1-611.08(c-2)), is amended as follows:  60 
 (1) Paragraph (8) is amended by striking the period “.” and inserting a  61 
semi-colon in its place. 62 
 (2) A new paragraph (8-a) is added to read as follows:  63 
 (8-a) Each member of the Advisory Committee appointed pursuant to section 3 of 64 
the Black LGBTQ History Preservation Establishment Act of 2024, as approved by the 65 
Committee on Public Works and Operations on February 8, 2024 (Committee print of Bill 25-66 
298), may receive compensation in the form of a stipend of not more than $100 per meeting of 67 
the Advisory Committee, in accordance with standards the Mayor may establish by 68   ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 	4 
rulemaking.”. 69 
 (b) Expenses incurred by the Advisory Committee as a whole, or by an individual 70 
member when the expense was duly authorized by the Office, shall be reimbursed pursuant to 71 
section 1108(d) of the District of Columbia Government Comprehensive Merit Personnel Act of 72 
1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-139; D.C. Official Code § 1-611.08(d)). 73 
 Sec. 5. Applicability.  74 
 (a) This act shall apply upon the date of inclusion of its fiscal effect in an approved 75 
budget and financial plan.  76 
 (b) The Chief Financial Officer shall certify the date of the inclusion of the fiscal effect in 77 
an approved budget and financial plan and provide notice to the Budget Director of the Council 78 
of the certification. 79 
 (c)(1) The Budget Director shall cause the notice of the certification to be published in 80 
the District of Columbia Register.  81 
 (2) The date of publication of the notice of the certification shall not affect the 82 
applicability of this act. 83 
 Sec. 6. Fiscal impact statement. 84 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement in the committee report as the fiscal 85 
impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 86 
approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 87 
 Sec. 7. Effective date. 88 
 This act shall take effect after approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 89   ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 	5 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto) and a 30-day period of congressional review 90 
as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 91 
24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)). 92