1 1 ______________________________ 2 Councilmember Kenyan R. McDuffie 3 4 5 6 A BILL 7 8 _________ 9 10 11 IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 12 13 __________________ 14 15 16 To amend, on an emergency basis, the Legalization of Marijuana for Medical Treatment 17 Initiative of 1999 to provide that the 5 cultivation center registration applicants that 18 scored 150 points or more after submitting a medical cannabis facility registration 19 application to the Alcoholic Beverage and Cannabis Board during the open application 20 period that occurred between November 29, 2021 and March 28, 2022, shall be 21 considered for a manufacturer license. 22 23 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 24 act may be cited as the “Medical Cannabis Manufacturer Clarification Emergency Amendment 25 Act of 2023”. 26 Sec. 2. Section 7 of the Legalization of Marijuana for Medical Treatment Initiative of 27 1999, effective February 25, 2010 (D.C. Law 13-315; D.C. Official Code § 7-1671.06), is 28 amended by adding new subsection (y) to read as follows: 29 “(y)(1) The 5 cultivation center registration applicants that submitted medical cannabis 30 facility registration applications to the ABC Board between November 29, 2021 and March 28, 31 2022, that scored 150 points or more shall be considered by the ABC Board for a manufacturer 32 license after the effective date of the Medical Cannabis Manufacturer Clarification Emergency 33 Amendment Act of 2023, passed on emergency basis on June 6, 2023 (Enrolled version of Bill 34 2 25-__); provided, that the applicant files a manufacturer license application with the ABC Board 35 by May 1, 2024. 36 Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 37 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 38 statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 39 October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 40 Sec. 4. Effective date. 41 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 42 Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 43 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 44 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 45 D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). 46