District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0304 Introduced / Bill

Filed 06/05/2023

                    1 
 
                                                                                                                1 
 ______________________________ 2 
Councilmember Kenyan R. McDuffie 3 
 4 
 5 
 6 
A BILL 7 
 8 
_________ 9 
 10 
 11 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 12 
 13 
__________________ 14 
 15 
 16 
To amend, on a temporary basis, the Legalization of Marijuana for Medical Treatment Initiative 17 
of 1999 to provide that the 5 cultivation center registration applicants that scored 150 18 
points or more after submitting a medical cannabis facility registration application to the 19 
Alcoholic Beverage and Cannabis Board during the open application period that occurred 20 
between November 29, 2021 and March 28, 2022 shall be considered for a manufacturer 21 
license.  22 
 23 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 24 
act may be cited as the “Medical Cannabis Manufacturer Clarification Temporary Amendment 25 
Act of 2023”. 26 
 Sec. 2. Section 7 of the Legalization of Marijuana for Medical Treatment Initiative of 27 
1999, effective February 25, 2010 (D.C. Law 13-315; D.C. Official Code § 7-1671.06), is 28 
amended by adding new subsection (y) to read as follows:  29 
 “(y)(1) The 5 cultivation center registration applicants that submitted medical cannabis 30 
facility registration applications to the ABC Board between November 29, 2021 and March 28, 31 
2022, that scored 150 points or more shall be considered by the ABC Board for a manufacturer 32 
license after the effective date of the Medical Cannabis Manufacturer Clarification Emergency 33 
Amendment Act of 2023, passed on emergency basis on June 6, 2023 (Enrolled version of Bill 34  2 
 
25-__); provided, that the applicant files a manufacturer license application with the ABC Board 35 
by May 1, 2024. 36 
Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 37 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 38 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 39 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 40 
 Sec. 4. Effective date. 41 
(a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 42 
the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review 43 
as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December  44 
24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1), and publication in the District of 45 
Columbia register.  46 
 (b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. 47