District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0343 Introduced / Bill

Filed 06/13/2023

                     
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
June 13, 2023 
Nyasha Smith, Secretary 
Council of the District of Columbia 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW 
Washington, DC 20004 
 
Dear Secretary Smith: 
 
Today, along with Councilmembers Brooke Pinto, Anita Bonds, Vincent C. Gray, Christina Henderson, 
Janeese Lewis George, and Zachary Parker, I am introducing the “Private Security Camera System 
Incentive Program Small Business Expansion Amendment Act of 2023.” Please find enclosed a signed 
copy of the legislation. 
 
In 2015, I introduced the Home Security Camera Tax Credit Amendment Act of 2015, which served as the 
basis for the District’s Private Security Camera System Incentive Program (“Program”). This highly 
successful Program, administered by the Office of Victim Services and Justice Grants, has funded more 
than 25,000 cameras across the District. The Program offers a rebate to individuals, non-profits, religious 
institutions, and businesses to install exterior cameras, provided the purchaser agrees to register the 
camera with the Metropolitan Police Department (“MPD”). MPD then uses footage from these cameras 
to help investigate crimes and close cases.  
 
But the recent break-ins at several small businesses along the H Street, NE Corridor have highlighted a 
need to provide additional support, particularly as expanded security infrastructure could have deterred 
the break-ins in the first place or allowed MPD to respond faster, rather than simply recording footage of 
the crimes as they were committed. The bill would therefore expand the Private Security Camera System 
Incentive Program to include rebates for small businesses that earn less than $2.5 million in federal gross 
receipts for security cameras or glass break sensors installed inside their buildings. The bill is needed to 
provide both deterrence and additional evidence to aid MPD in its efforts to solve crimes. 
 
Please feel free to reach out to me or my Legislative Director, Antonio Nunes, with any questions or for 
additional information.  
 
Sincerely, 
 
 
 
Charles Allen, Ward 6 Councilmember 
Chairperson, Committee on Transportation & the Environment 
Vice Chair, Metropolitan Washington Council of Governments    
1 
___________________________ 	______________________________ 1 
Councilmember Brooke Pinto 	Councilmember Charles Allen  2 
 3 
 4 
___________________________ 	______________________________ 5 
Councilmember Anita Bonds  	Councilmember Vincent C. Gray 6 
 7 
 8 
___________________________ 	______________________________ 9 
Councilmember Christina Henderson 	Councilmember Zachary Parker 10 
 11 
 12 
___________________________  13 
Councilmember Janeese Lewis George 14 
 15 
 16 
A BILL 17 
 18 
________ 19 
 20 
 21 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 22 
 23 
_________________ 24 
 25 
 26 
To amend the Neighborhood Engagement Achieves Results Amendment Act of 2016 to expand 27 
the Private Security Camera System Incentive Program, administered by the Office of 28 
Victim Services and Justice Grants, to reimburse small businesses for security camera 29 
systems and glass break sensors installed on the interiors of their businesses.   30 
 31 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 32 
act may be cited as the “Private Security Camera System Incentive Program Small Business 33 
Expansion Amendment Act of 2023”. 34 
Sec. 2. Section 214 of the Neighborhood Engagement Achieves Results Amendment Act 35 
of 2016, effective June 30, 2016 (D.C. Law 21-125; D.C. Official Code § 7-2831), is amended as 36 
follows: 37 
(a) Subsection (a) is amended to read as follows: 38   
2 
“(a)(1) There is established a Private Security Camera System Incentive Program 39 
(“Program”), to be administered by the Mayor, to encourage the purchase and installation of the 40 
following: 41 
 “(A) A security camera system on the exterior of a building owned or 42 
leased by an individual, business, nonprofit, religious institution, or an entity as that term is 43 
defined in § 29-101.02(10);  44 
“(B) A security camera system on the interior of a building owned or 45 
leased by a business that has less than $2,500,000 federal gross receipts or sales; and 46 
 “(C) Glass break sensors installed on the interior of a building owned or 47 
leased by a business that has less than $2,500,000 federal gross receipts or sales. 48 
 “(2) A security camera system purchased and installed pursuant to paragraphs 49 
(1)(A) or (B) of this subsection shall be registered with the Metropolitan Police Department.”. 50 
(b) Subsection (b) is amended as follows: 51 
 (1) Paragraph (1) is amended to read as follows: 52 
 “(1) Purchase and install: 53 
 “(A) After September 22, 2015, a security camera system on the exterior 54 
of the building; 55 
“(B) After the effective date of the Private Security Camera System 56 
Incentive Program Small Business Expansion Amendment Act of 2023, as introduced on June 57 
13, 2023 (B25-___), a security camera system installed on the interior of a building owned or 58 
leased by a business that has less than $2,500,000 federal gross receipts or sales; or 59 
 “(C) After the effective date of the Private Security Camera System 60 
Incentive Program Small Business Expansion Amendment Act of 2023, as introduced on June 61   
3 
13, 2023 (B25-___), glass break sensors installed on the interior of the building owned or leased 62 
by a business that has less than $2,500,000 federal gross receipts or sales;”. 63 
 (2) Paragraph (2) is amended to read as follows: 64 
 “(2) For security camera systems installed on the exterior or interior of a building, 65 
register the system with the Metropolitan Police Department;”.  66 
(c) Subsection (c) is amended as follows: 67 
 (1) Paragraph (1) is amended as follows: 68 
 (A) The lead-in language is amended by striking the phrase “the system” 69 
and inserting the phrase “the system or glass break sensors” in its place. 70 
 (B) Subparagraph (A) is amended by striking the phrase “; or” and 71 
inserting a semicolon in its place. 72 
 (C) Subparagraph (B) is amended as follows: 73 
(i) Strike the phrase “exterior of a building owned or leased by a 74 
business, nonprofit, religious institution or other entity as defined in” and insert the phrase 75 
“interior or exterior of a building owned or leased by an individual, religious institution, or 76 
entity, as that term is defined in;” in its place. 77 
(ii) Strike the period and insert the phrase “; or” in its place. 78 
 (D) A new subparagraph (C) is added to read as follows: 79 
 “(C) Up to $200 for glass break sensors installed on the interior of a 80 
building owned or leased by a business that has less than $2,500,000 federal gross receipts or 81 
sales.”. 82 
 (2) Paragraph (3) is repealed. 83 
(d) Subsection (f) is amended as follows: 84   
4 
 (1) Paragraph (1) is amended by striking the phrase “system verification” and 85 
inserting the phrase “verification of the security camera system or glass break sensors” in its 86 
place. 87 
 (2) Paragraph (2) is amended by striking the phrase “a system” and inserting the 88 
phrase “a security camera system” in its place.  89 
(e) Subsection (h) is amended as follows: 90 
 (1) The lead-in language is amended by striking the phrase “From Janaury 15, 91 
2016” and inserting the phrase “From January 15, 2016” in its place. 92 
(2) Paragraph (2) is amended by striking the phrase “private security cameras” 93 
and inserting the phrase “private security cameras and glass break sensors” in its place.  94 
 (3) Paragraph (4) is amended by striking the phrase “subsection (c)(1)(A) or (B)” 95 
and inserting the phrase “subsection (c)(1)(A), (B), or (C)” in its place. 96 
(f) Subsection (i) is amended to read as follows: 97 
“(i) For the purposes of this section, the term “security camera system” means one or 98 
more indoor or outdoor surveillance cameras with functioning digital video recording 99 
capability.”. 100 
Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 101 
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement in the committee report as the fiscal 102 
impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 103 
approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 104 
Sec. 4. Effective date.  105 
This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 106 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review as 107 
provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 108   
5 
24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of 109 
Columbia Register. 110