District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0350 Introduced / Bill

Filed 06/27/2023

                    MATTHEW FRUMIN 
Councilmember, Ward 3 
Nyasha Smith 
Secretary 
of the Council 
COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
JOHN A. WILSON BUILDING 
1350 PENNSYLVANIA AVENUE, NW 
WASHINGTON, DC 20004 
COMMITTEE MEMBER 
Executive Administration and Labor 
Facilities and Family Services 
Hospital a
nd Health Equity 
Housing 
Transportation and the Environment 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue 	NW 
Washington, DC 20004 
June 27, 2023 
Dear Secretary Smith: 
Today, I am introducing the "MacArthur High School Designation Act 
of 2023". I look forward to the 
opening 
of this new high school in Ward 3, beginning in the 2023-2024 school year, and am grateful 
for the work done by District 
of Columbia Public Schools (DCPS), the MacArthur High School staff, 
and the neighboring community to set our students up for success. 
This legislation, a signed copy 
of which is enclosed, comes at the request 	of DCPS to ensure the new 
high school 
is adequately prepared for the coming school year. Making official the current temporary 
name "MacArthur High School" will enable the school to begin procurement 
of necessary materials 
for students, staff, and the facility. 
During the Community Working Group process for the high school, DCPS conducted a public online 
survey 
to solicit school name nominations. More than 540 community members participated, and the 
name "MacArthur High School" received the most support.' Many respondents emphasized the desire 
for continuity by maintaining the name that DCPS and the community had been using for more than a 
year, 
as well as designating a name based on a location, not a person: the high school 	is located on 
MacArthur Boulevard. I support both sentiments. 
Should you have any questions about this legislation, please contact my Legislative Assistant, Elias 
Benda, at ebenda@dccouncil.gov or (202) 394-8293. 
Sincerely, 
7Y1J1w 
Matthew Frumin 
Councilmember for Ward 3 
1 
DCPS, MacArthur High Sch ool -Community Working Gro	up Meeting #3 (Aug. 8, 2022) 
https://dcps.dc.gov/sites/default/
files/dc/sites/dcps/page content/attachments/MacArthur%20CWG%20Meeti ng%203%20-
%20Presentation%202022.08.08.
pdf 
*** 
MATTFRUMINWARD3 .COM I (202) 724-8062  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 	AB~L 
8 
9 
10 
11 
~ 
Councilmember Matthew Frumin 
12 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 To designate the school in 	Lot 0899 in Square 1356, bounded 	by MacArthur Boulevard, N.W., Q 
18 St. N.W., Clark Place N.W., and Laverock Place N.W., as 	MacArthur High School. 
19 
20 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
21 act may be cited as the "MacArthur High School Designation 	Act of 2023". 
22 Sec. 2. Pursuant to sections 401 and 422(b) through (e) 
of the Street and Alley Closing 
23 and Acquisition Procedures Act 
of 1982, effective March 10, 1983 (D.C. 	Law 4-201; D.C. 
24 Official 
Code§§ 9-204. 01 and 9-204.22(b) through (e)) ("Act"), and notwithstanding section 
25 422(a) 
of the Act (D.C. Official Code§ 9-204.22(a)), the Council designates the school in Lot 
26 0899 in Square 1356, bounded by 
MacArthur Boulevard, N.W., Q St. N.W., Clark Place N.W., 
27 and Laverock Place N.W., as 
"MacArthur High School". 
28 Sec. 
3. Fiscal impact statement. 
29 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement in the committee report as the fiscal 
30 impact statement required 
by section 4aofthe General Legislative Procedures Act 	of 1975, 
31 approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official 	Code§ l-301.47a). 
32 Sec. 
4. Effective date . 
1  33 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event 	of veto by the 
34 Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period 
of congressional review as 
3 5 provided in section 602( c )( 	1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 
36 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official 
Code§ 1-206.02(c)(l)), and publication 	in the District of 
3 7 Columbia Register. 
2