District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0355 Introduced / Bill

Filed 06/29/2023

                    MURIEL BOWSER 
MAYOR 
June 29, 2023 
The Honorable Phil Mendelson 
Chairman 
Council 
of the District of Columbia 
John A. Wilson Building 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504 
Washington, DC 20004 
Dear Chairman Mendelson: 
Enclosed for consideration and enactment by the Council 
of the District of Columbia are the 
"Floodplain Review Authority Amendment Act 
of 2023," the "Floodplain Review Authority 
Temporary Amendment Act 
of2023," and the "Floodplain Review Authority Emergency 
Amendment Act 
of2023," along with an accompanying emergency declaration resolution. 
The legislation would repeal section 6B 
of the District of Columbia Applications Insurance 
Implementation Act, effective April 5, 2021 (D.C. Law 23-269; D.C. Official 
Code§ 6-507), to 
allow the Mayor to continue to delegate the functions 
of that act to the Director of the 
Department 
of Energy and Environment ("DOEE"). DOEE has historically exercised the 
authority 
of the Applications Insurance Act to implement regulations relating to flood hazards 
and safety in the District, and DOEE has been identified by the Mayor as the District 
coordination agency for the National Flood Insurance Program ("NFIP"), as required by the 
Federal Emergency Management Agency. Repeal 
of section 6B will ensure that the District 
continues to maintain, and thus obtain the benefits of, its membership in the NFIP. 
I urge the Council to take prompt and favorable action on the enclosed legislation.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
A 
BILL 
~~~ 
Chairman Phil Mendelson 
at the request of the Mayor 
9 	IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 To amend, on a temporary basis, the District of Columbia Applications Insurance 
15 Implementation Act to repeal the direction to the 	Mayor that the functions of the act be 
16 delegated to the Director 	of the Department of Buildings. 
17 
18 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
19 act may 
be cited as the "Floodplain Review Authority Temporary Amendment Act of2023". 
20 Sec. 2. Section 6B of the District of Columbia Applications Insurance Implementation 
21 Act, effective April 5, 2021 (D.C. 	Law 23-269; D.C. Official Code§ 6-507), is repealed. 
22 Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 
23 
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement 	of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal 
24 impact statement required by section 	4a of the General Legislative Procedures 	Act of 197 5, 
25 approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official 	Code§ 1-301.47a). 
26 Sec. 4. Effective date. 
27 (a) This act shall take effect following approval by the 	Mayor (or in the event of veto by 
28 the Mayor, action 	by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period 	of congressional review 
29 as provided in section 602( c )(1) 
of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 
30 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official 	Code§ 1-206.02(c)(l)), and publication in the District 	of 
31 Columbia Register.  32 (b) This act shall expire after 225 days 	of its having taken effect. 
2  GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL 
BRIAN L. SCHWALB 
ATTORNEY GENERAL 
LEGAL COUNSEL DIVISION 
MEMORANDUM 
TO: Dan Emerine 
Legislative Director 
*** 
Department of Energy and Environment 
FROM: Megan D. Browder MD !3 
Deputy Attorney General 
Legal Counsel Division 
DATE: June 27, 2023 
PRIVILEGED AND CONFIDENTIAL 
ATTORNEY-CLIENT COMMlJNICA TION 
SUBJECT: Legal Sufficiency Review -Draft "Floodplain Review Authority Emergency 
Amendment Act 
of 2023," "Floodplain Review Authority Temporary Amendment 
Act 
of 2023," "Floodplain Review Authority Emergency Declaration Resolution 	of 
2023," and "Floodplain Review Authority Amendment Act 	of 2023" 
(AE-23-423 B) 
This legislation would repeal a recent addition to the District 	of Columbia Applications Insurance 
Implementation Act ("Insurance Act"). 
1 
That act requires the review 	of building permit applications, 
subdivision proposals, sewage systems, and more for potential flood hazards. 
2 
The Mayor has delegated 
administration 
of the Insurance Act to your Department, 
3 
but the Council recently directed the Mayor to 
move that delegation to the new Department 
of Buildings.
4 
This legislation would repeal that direction. It 
is legally sufficient. 
5 
If you have any questions regarding this memorandum, please contact Joshua Turner, Assistant Attorney 
General, Legal Counsel Division, at (202) 442-9834, or me at (202) 724-5524. 
MDB/
jat 
1 
Effective May 26, 1976 (D.C. Law 1-64; D.C. Official Code § 6-50 I 	et seq.). 
2 
See D.C. Official Code§§ 6-501---6-504. 
3 
See, e.g., Mayor's Order 2007-61, dated June 	14, 2006. 
4 
Department of Buildings Establishment Act 	of 2020, § 501 (b), effective Apr. 5, 	2021 (D.C. Law 23-269; 68 DCR 4174). 
5 
The repeal of this direction would also make it unnecessary for us to resolve whether that direction impermissibly abridged 
the Mayor's delegation authority under the Charter. 
See D.C. Official Code § 1-204.22(6) (authorizing the Mayor 	to delegate 
her functions 
to "any director of an executive department"). 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.
W., Suite 409, Washington, D.C. 20004 Phone (202) 724-5524 Email: megan.browder@dc.gov  GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL 
BRIAN L. SCHWALB 
ATTORNEY GENERAL 
LEGAL COUNSEL DJVJSTON 
MEMORANDUM 
TO: Tommy Wells 
Director 
*** 
Office of Policy and Legislative Affairs 
FROM: Megan D. Browder 
Deputy Attorney General 
Legal Counsel Division 
DATE: 
June 27, 2023 
PRIVILEGED AND CONFIDENTIAL 
ATTORNEY-CLIENT COMMUNICATION 
SUBJECT: Legal Sufficiency Review -	Draft "Floodplain Review Authority Emergency 
Amendment Act 
of 2023," "Floodplain Review Authority 	Temporary Amendment 
Act 
of 2023," "Floodplain Review Authority Emergency Declaration Resolution 	of 
2023," and "Floodplain Review Authority 	Amendment Act of 2023" 
(AE-23-423 B) 
This is to Certify that 	this Office has reviewed the above-referenced 	draft 
legislation and found it to be legally sufficient. If you have any questions in this regard, please do 
not hesitate to call me 
at (202) 724-5524. 
Megan D. 
Browder 
2