District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0367 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 07/11/2023

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
AN ACT 
 
_________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
__________________ 
 
 
To amend, on an emergency basis, the Legalization of Marijuana for Medical Treatment 
Initiative of 1999 to allow the Alcoholic Beverage and Cannabis Board (“ABC Board”) 
to issue temporary non-resident registration identification cards that are valid for periods 
between 3 days and no longer than one year in length, allow licensed testing laboratories 
to receive and test samples of medical cannabis products from qualifying patients, allow 
licensed testing laboratories to conduct quality assurance or research and development 
testing for cultivation centers and manufacturers, amend the definition of a social equity 
applicant to include arrests and convictions of qualifying family members for a cannabis 
or drug offense, expand the list of eligible family members under the social equity 
applicant definition to include siblings and grandparents, clarify that existing licensed 
cultivation centers and retailers and applicants that scored 150 points or more during the 
open application period that occurred between November 29, 2021 and March 28, 2022, 
that are authorized by statute to receive a cultivation center, manufacturer, or retailer 
license apart from a designated open application period are not counted in calculating the 
50% set aside requirement, clarify that the 5 cultivation center registration applicants that 
scored 150 points or more during the same open application period shall automatically 
receive a manufacturer license provided that they pay the annual fee and register with the 
ABC Board, allow the Alcoholic Beverage and Cannabis Administration to issue 
conditional licenses to testing laboratory applicants, and to waive the application fee for 
testing laboratory licenses.  
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “Medical Cannabis Clarification and Non-Resident Patient Access 
Emergency Amendment Act of 2023”. 
 
 Sec. 2. The Legalization of Marijuana for Medical Treatment Initiative of 1999, effective 
February 25, 2010 (D.C. Law 13-315; D.C. Official Code § 7-1671.01 et seq.), is amended as 
follows: 
(a) Section 2 (D.C. Official Code § 7-1671.01) is amended as follows: 
(1) Paragraph (13B)(B) is amended by striking the phrase “30-day registration    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
identification card” and inserting the phrase "registration identification card valid for periods 
established by the ABC Board by rulemaking, which are between 3 days and no longer than one 
year in length” in its place. 
(2) Paragraph (20C)(B) is amended by striking the phrase “or has a non-parent legal 
guardian who is or has been incarcerated” and inserting the phrase “or has a non-parent legal 
guardian, or a grandparent or a sibling who is or has been arrested, convicted, or incarcerated”.  
(b) Section 6(b) (D.C. Official Code § 7-1671.05(b)) is amended as follows: 
(1) Paragraph (4) is amended as follows: 
                         (A) Subparagraph (A) is amended by striking the phrase “30 days” and 
inserting the phrase "periods established by the ABC Board by rulemaking, which are between 3 
days and no longer than one year in length”. 
(B) Subparagraph (B) is amended by striking the phrase "30-day”. 
(2) Paragraph (5)(C) is amended by striking the phrase "3 years.” and inserting the 
phrase “3 years, except for temporary non-resident registration identification cards that are valid 
for periods established by the ABC Board by rulemaking, which shall be between 3 days and no 
longer than one year in length.” in its place. 
      (3) A new paragraph (11A) is added to read as follows: 
 “(11A) Allow testing laboratories to:  
 “(A) Receive and test samples of medical cannabis products from 
qualifying patients; provided, that the qualifying patient must present proof that he or she is 
currently registered, and that the medical cannabis product was purchased from a retailer or 
internet retailer licensed with ABCA. 
 “(B) Receive and test samples of medical cannabis products from licensed 
cultivation centers or manufacturers for purposes of quality assurance or research and 
development. Samples collected for quality assurance or research and development testing may 
be selected by the cultivation center or manufacturer non-randomly. Any tests conducted for 
purposes of quality assurance or research and development shall not satisfy the requirements of 
paragraphs (8) through (11) of this subsection.”. 
(c) Section 7 (D.C. Official Code § 7-1671.06) is amended as follows: 
(1) Subsection (h) is amended by striking the phrase "cultivation centers who 
receive a manufacturer’s license pursuant to subsection (d) of this section.” and inserting the 
phrase "cultivation centers and retailers, and applicants who scored 150 points or more during 
the ABC Board open application period that occurred between November 29, 2021 and March 
28, 2022, who receive a cultivation center, manufacturer, or retailer’s license pursuant to 
subsections (d), (w), (x) and (y) of this section.”. 
      (2) Subsection (k)(1) is amended to read as follows: 
 “(k)(1) The ABC Board shall be authorized to issue a one-year conditional license for a 
cultivation center, retailer, internet retailer, manufacturer, courier, or testing laboratory that does 
not currently have a proposed location.”.    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
3 
 
     (3) Subsection (n)(2) is amended to read as follows: 
 “(2)(A) The ABC Board shall, by rules issued pursuant to section 14, establish the 
initial application and renewal fees for cultivation center, manufacturer, retailer, internet retailer, 
and courier licenses. The ABC Board may revise these fees as considered necessary. 
 “(B) There shall be no initial application fee for a testing laboratory 
license. Renewal fees for a testing laboratory license shall be established by rules issued pursuant 
to sub-paragraph (A) of this paragraph.”. 
(3)  A new subsection (y) is added to read as follows: 
                            “(y) The 5 cultivation center registration applicants that submitted medical 
cannabis facility registration applications to the ABC Board between November 29, 2021 and 
March 28, 2022, that scored 150 points or more shall automatically receive a manufacturer 
license provided that the annual fee is paid after the effective date of the Medical Cannabis 
Manufacturer Clarification Emergency Amendment Act of 2023, effective June 29, 2023 (D.C. 
Act 25-152; 70 DCR 9410); provided, that the applicant registers on a form provided by ABCA 
with the ABC Board by May 1, 2024.”. 
 
 Sec. 3. Repealer. 
 The Medical Cannabis Manufacturer Clarification Temporary Amendment Act of 2023, 
enacted on July 10, 2023; 70 DCR ___), is repealed. 
 
Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 
 
 Sec. 5. Effective date. 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section  
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
4 
 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 
D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)).  
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia