District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0389 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 07/11/2023

                      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
AN ACT 
 
 ___________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
_______________ 
 
 
To amend, on an emergency basis, the Universal Paid Leave Amendment Act of 2016 to 
prohibit private disability insurance providers from reducing short-term disability 
benefits based on actual or estimated paid leave benefits to which an eligible 
individual may be entitled from the District, regardless of the jurisdiction in which 
the insurance policy was issued or written; and to amend Title I of the Insurance 
Trade and Economic Development Amendment Act of 2000 to make the 
prohibition on offsetting or reducing benefits under a private market short-term 
disability insurance policy based on estimated or actual benefits received under the 
Universal Paid Leave Amendment Act of 2016 enforceable under that law 
regardless of the jurisdiction in which the insurance policy was issued or written. 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “Short-Term Disability Insurance Benefit Protection Clarification 
Emergency Amendment Act of 2023”. 
 
 Sec. 2. Section 107(j)(1) of the Universal Paid Leave Amendment Act of 2016, effective 
April 7, 2017 (D.C. Law 21-264; D.C. Official Code § 32-541.07(j)(1)), is amended to read as 
follows: 
“(1) No insurer may offset or reduce benefits or income available to an eligible 
individual under an individual or group policy for temporary or short-term disability insurance 
based on estimated or actual benefits the eligible individual may or does receive under this act, 
regardless of the jurisdiction in which such policy was issued, executed, written, or delivered.”. 
 
Sec. 3. Section 120a the Insurance Trade and Economic Development Amendment Act of 
2000, effective November 13, 2021 (D.C. Law 24-45; D.C. Official Code § 31-2231.20a), is 
amended as follows: 
(a) Subsection (a) is amended to read as follows: 
“(a) No insurer may offset or reduce benefits or income available to an eligible individual 
under a temporary or short-term disability insurance policy, based on estimated or actual benefits 
the eligible individual may or does receive under the Universal Paid Leave Amendment Act of    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
2016, effective April 7, 2017 (D.C. Law 21-264; D.C. Official Code § 32-541.01 et seq.), 
regardless of in which jurisdiction such policy was executed, written, or delivered.”. 
(b) Subsection (c) is amended to read as follows: 
“(c) For the purposes of this section, the term: 
 “(1) “Eligible individual” shall have the same meaning as provided in section 
101(6) of the Universal Paid Leave Amendment Act of 2016, effective April 7, 2017 (D.C. Law 
21-264; D.C. Official Code § 32-541.01(6)). 
 “(2) “Self-insured employer” shall have the same meaning as provided in section 
101(19A) of the Universal Paid Leave Amendment Act of 2016, effective April 7, 2017 (D.C. 
Law 21-264; D.C. Official Code § 32-541.01(19A)).”. 
 
Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement.  
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).  
 
Sec. 5. Effective date.  
This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 
D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)).  
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia