June 30, 2023 The Honorable Phil Mendelson Chairman Council of the District of Columbia John A. Wilson Building 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W., Suite 504 Washington, D.C. 20004 Dear Chairman Mendelson: Enclosed for consideration and approval by the Council of the District of Columbia is proposed legislation entitled the "Litter Control Amendment Act of 2023." This legislation would amend D.C. Official Code§ 8-803 to provide the Department of Public Works (DPW) the ability to serve a party cited for an infraction of the Litter Control Administration Act of 1985 with a Notice of Violation (NOV) via first-class mail. It would also provide that when such service is by first-class mail, 5 (five) additional days shall be added to the time period within which the party cited may or is required to take any action specified in the NOV. It also clarifies that a residential premises may be inspected and investigated for an alleged nuisance. The legislation would help remedy certain inconsistencies in current law and regulations regarding effective service of an NOV for violations of the Litter Control Administration Act and the ability of DPW to successfully file a case with the Office of Administrative Hearings (OAH) for such a violation. If you have any questions on this matter, please contact Timothy W. Spriggs, Director, Department of Public Works, at (202)-673-6833. Sincerely, I 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28 29 30 31 32 A BILL 1rman Phil Mendelson at the request of the Mayor IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA To amend the Litter Control Administration Act of 1985 to authorize service of a notice of violation by first-class mail to a person alleged to have created a nuisance or to the owner of the premises and to clarify that a residential premises may be inspected and investigated for an alleged nuisance. BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this act may be cited as the "Litter Control Amendment Act of 2023". Sec. 2. Section 4 of the Litter Control Administration Act of 1985, effective March 25, 1986 (D.C. Law 6-100; D.C. Official Code§ 8-803), is amended as follows: ( a) Subsection (b) is amended by striking the word "nonresidential" and inserting the phrase "residential or nonresidential" in its place. (b) Subsection (c)(2) is amended as follows: ( 1) The existing text is designated as subparagraph (A). (2) The newly designated subparagraph (A) is amended by: (i) Striking the phrase "the person responsible" and inserting the phrase "a person responsible" in its place; and (ii) Striking the phrase this subsection." and inserting the phrase "this subsection; or" in its place. (3) A new subparagraph (B) is added to read as follows: "(B) As an alternative to the process described in subparagraph (A) of this 2 paragraph, the Mayor may deliver the notice of violation by first-class mail to the owner of the 3 premises or to a person responsible for the nuisance. When service is by first-class mail, 5 4 additional days shall be added to the time period within which the premises owner or person 5 responsible for the nuisance may, or is required to, take any action specified in the notice.". 6 Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 7 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement in the committee report as the fiscal 8 impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 9 approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code§ 1-301.47a). 10 Sec. 4. Effective date. 11 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 12 Mayor, action by the Council to ovenide the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review as 13 provided in section 602( c )(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 14 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code§ l-206.02(c)(l)), and publication in the District of 15 Columbia Register. 2 GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL BIUAN L. SCHWALB ATTORNEY GENERAL LEGAL COUNSEL DIVISION MEMORANDUM TO: Tommy Wells Director *** Office of Policy and Legislative Affairs FROM: Megan D. Browder Deputy Attorney General Legal Counsel Division DATE: April 21, 2023 PRIVILEGED AND CONFIDENTIAL ATTORNEY-CLIENT COMMUNICATION SUBJECT: Legal Sufficiency Review - Draft "Litter Control Notice of Violation Service Amendment Act of 2023" (AE-23-164) This is to Certify that this Office has reviewed the above-referenced draft legislation and found it to be legally sufficient. If you have any questions in this regard, please do not hesitate to call me at (202) 724-5524. Megan D. Browder 3 Glen Lee Chief Financial Officer MEMORANDUM TO: FROM: DATE: SUBJECT: REFERENCE: Conclusion Government of the District of Columbia Office of the Chief Financial Officer * * * May 24, 2023 Fiscal Impact Statement-Litter Control Notice of Violation Service Amendment Act of2023 Draft Bill as provided to the Office of Revenue Analysis on April 21, 2023 Funds are sufficient in the fiscal year 2023 budget and proposed fiscal year 2024 through fiscal year 2027 budget and financial plan to implement the bill. Background The Department of Public Works (DPW) Solid Waste Education and Enforcement Program (SWEEP) team educates District property owners and investigates solid waste, sanitation, and recycling complaints or other potential nuisance conditions. If the SWEEP team discovers a condition that requires action, it can issue a Notice of Violation (NOV) to the person who created the nuisance or to the property owner. DPW can personally serve the NOV, affix it to the premises, or send it to the person responsible or owner via certified mail. 1 The bill authorizes DPW to also serve an NOV via first-class mail. If DPW chooses to serve the NOV via first-class mail, then DPW must give the recipient five additional days to take any action indicated on the NOV. 1 Litter Control Administration Act of 1985, effective March 25, 1986 (D.C. Law 6-100; D.C. Official Code§ 8- 803). 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 203, Washington, DC 20004 (202)727-2476 www.cfo.dc.gov The Honorable Phil Mendelson FIS: "Litter Control Notice of Violation Service Amendment Act of 2023," Draft Bill as provided to the Office of Revenue Analysis on April 21, 2023 Financial Plan Impact Funds are sufficient in the fiscal year 2023 budget and proposed fiscal year 2024 through fiscal year 2027 budget and financial plan to implement the bill. DPW will, when appropriate, use first-class mail instead of certified mail. DPW's planned use of first-class mail could save the agency over $300,000 annually depending on how many notices the agency sends using first-class rather than certified mail. Page 2 of2